EP0958715 - BALLAST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.08.2004 [2004/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATTAS, Charles, B. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / US | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Dusseldorp, Jan Charles Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | Dusseldorp, Jan Charles INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 98954696.5 | 03.12.1998 | [1999/47] | WO1998IB01931 | Priority number, date | US19970987700 | 09.12.1997 Original published format: US 987700 | [1999/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9930538 | Date: | 17.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0958715 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0958715 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 17.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/04 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
H05B41/042 (EP,US);
Y10S315/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/47] | Title | German: | VORSCHALTGERÄT | [1999/47] | English: | BALLAST | [1999/47] | French: | BALLAST | [1999/47] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/07] | 06.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4461982 (FAEHNRICH HANS-JUERGEN [DE]); | [A]EP0383385 (PHILIPS CORP [US]); | [A]WO9708921 (TRIDONIC BAUELEMENTE [AT], et al) |