EP1028768 - INHALATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca UK Limited 15 Stanhope Gate London W1Y 6LN / GB | [2000/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HODSON, Darren Astra Charnwood, Bakewell Road, Loughborough Leics LE11 5RH / GB | 02 /
RASMUSSEN, J rgen Bang & Olufsen Technology a/s, Bödkervej 2 DK-7600 Struer / DK | [2000/34] | Application number, filing date | 98954906.8 | 11.11.1998 | [2000/34] | WO1998SE02038 | Priority number, date | SE19970004185 | 14.11.1997 Original published format: SE 9704185 | [2000/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9925406 | Date: | 27.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1028768 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00, A61M11/00 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
A61M15/0021 (EP,US);
A61M15/00 (KR);
A61M15/0065 (US);
A61M11/04 (US);
A61M15/0025 (EP,US);
A61M15/0068 (EP,US);
A61M15/009 (EP,US);
A61M15/0091 (US);
A61M2205/273 (EP,US);
A61M2205/59 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/34] | Extension states | LT | 14.06.2000 | LV | 14.06.2000 | MK | 14.06.2000 | RO | 14.06.2000 | SI | 14.06.2000 | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR INHALATION | [2000/34] | English: | INHALATION DEVICE | [2000/34] | French: | INHALATEUR | [2000/34] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 14.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 24.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/33] | 12.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3739950 (GORMAN J); | [A]US4641644 (ANDERSSON JAN A R [SE], et al); | [A]WO9507723 (MEDTRAC TECH INC [US]); | [X]US5520166 (RITSON CARL [US], et al) |