EP1024977 - CRASH DETECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KEY SAFETY SYSTEMS, INC. 7000 Nineteen Mile Road Sterling Heights, MI 48314 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states KEY SAFETY SYSTEMS, INC. 7000 Nineteen Mile Road Sterling Heights, Michigan 48314 / US | ||
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states Breed Automotive Technology, Inc. 5300 Allen K. Breed Highway, P.O. Box 33050 Lakeland, Florida 33807-3050 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIOUTSOS, Tony 23733 Wintergreen Circle Novi, MI 48374 / US | 02 /
WHITE, Craig 25330 Interchange Court Farmington Hills, MI 48335 / US | 03 /
ZAHN, Brian, J. 42246 Brentwood Drive Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | 04 /
TABAR, Daniel, N. 979 Oak Creek Drive South Lyon, MI 48178 / US | 05 /
MILO, David, C. 25330 Interchange Court Farmington Hills, MI 48335 / US | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Gislon, Gabriele Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | Gislon, Gabriele Marietti e Gislon S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 98955066.0 | 23.10.1998 | [2000/32] | WO1998US22421 | Priority number, date | US19970063229P | 23.10.1997 Original published format: US 63229 P | [2000/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9920491 | Date: | 29.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1024977 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1024977 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.04.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/00, B60R21/13, B60R21/32, G01P15/00, G01P15/16, B60R21/01 | [2003/15] | CPC: |
B60R21/0132 (EP,US);
B60R21/00 (KR);
B60R21/013 (EP,US);
B60R21/01558 (EP,US);
B60R2021/0004 (EP,US);
B60R2021/0006 (EP,US);
B60R2021/01027 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/32] | B60R21/00, B60R21/13, B60R21/32, G01P15/00, G01P15/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/32] | Title | German: | AUFPRALLSENSORSYSTEM | [2000/32] | English: | CRASH DETECTION SYSTEM | [2000/32] | French: | DETECTEUR DE COLLISION | [2000/32] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2000 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 23.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 26.01.2005 | IT | 26.01.2005 | DE | 27.04.2005 | ES | 07.05.2005 | GB | 23.10.2005 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/18] | FR | 26.01.2005 | |
DE | 27.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
GB | 23.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | FR | 26.01.2005 | |
DE | 27.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/18] | DE | 27.04.2005 | |
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | ES | 07.05.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE4030823 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,10 * the whole document * [Y] 2-9,11-27; | [Y]WO9609942 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE], et al) [Y] 2-9,11-27 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5571994 (NORTON PETER [US]) [Y] 8,19,21 * figure 4 *; | [PX]WO9748582 (AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LAB [US]) [PX] 1,10,21 * the whole document *; | [E]EP0982199 (AUTOLIVE JAPAN LTD [JP]) [E] 1 * figure 1 * | International search | [A]US4995639 (BREED DAVID S [US]); | [A]US5440913 (CRISPIN NORBERT [DE], et al); | [X]US5544716 (WHITE CRAIG W [US]); | [Y]US5610817 (MAHON GEOFFREY L [US], et al) |