EP1042786 - UNDERCUTTING TECHNIQUE FOR CREATING COATING IN SPACED-APART SEGMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2007/18] |
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states Candescent Technologies Corporation 6320 San Ignacio Avenue San Jose, CA 95119 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNALL, Johan, N. 1055 Westchester Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/44] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/41] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 98955146.0 | 27.10.1998 | [2000/41] | WO1998US22761 | Priority number, date | US19970962527 | 31.10.1997 Original published format: US 962527 | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9923689 | Date: | 14.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1042786 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1042786 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.05.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01J9/02, H01L21/00 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
H01J9/025 (EP,US);
H01J9/02 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2004/40] | H01L21/00, H01J9/02 | ||
Former IPC [2000/41] | H01L21/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, NL [2000/41] | Title | German: | UNTERSCHNEIDUNGSTECHNIK FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON BESCHICHTUNGEN IN VON EINANDER ENTFERNTEN SEGMENTEN | [2000/41] | English: | UNDERCUTTING TECHNIQUE FOR CREATING COATING IN SPACED-APART SEGMENTS | [2000/41] | French: | TECHNIQUE D'AFFOUILLEMENT DESTINEE A CREER DES SEGMENTS ESPACES DE REVETEMENT | [2000/41] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2000 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 09.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 02.03.2011 | IE | 27.10.2011 | FR | 02.11.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/37] | NL | 02.03.2011 | |
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | NL | 02.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5647785 (JONES GARY WAYNE [US], et al) [A] 1,14,22,25 * claims 1-14 * | International search | [A]US5656530 (LEARY DAVID J [US]) | Examination | JPH05226375 | JPH07183196 | JPH08305042 | by applicant | WO1998US12801 |