EP1030833 - PREPARATION OF QUINONEDIIMINES FROM PHENYLENEDIAMINES USING A HYPOCHLORITE AS AN OXIDATION AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLEXSYS AMERICA L.P. 260 Springside Drive, P.O. Box 5444 Akron, Ohio 44333-0444 / US | [2000/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LODAYA, Jayant, S. 555 Pebble Beach Drive Akron, OH 44333 / US | 02 /
LOHR, Raymond, A. 3864 Long Road Avon, OH 44011 / US | 03 /
FIELDS, Donald, L., Jr. 4367 Cypress Court Copley, OH 44321 / US | [2000/35] | Representative(s) | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis, et al Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis, et al AKZO NOBEL N.V. Intellectual Property Department PO Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [2000/35] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis, et al Akzo Nobel N.V., Intellectual Property Department (Dept. AIP), P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 98955160.1 | 27.10.1998 | [2000/35] | WO1998US22803 | Priority number, date | US19970063764 | 29.10.1997 Original published format: US 63764 | US19980089551 | 03.06.1998 Original published format: US 89551 | [2000/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9921826 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1030833 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1030833 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.05.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07C249/02 | [2000/35] | CPC: |
C07C249/02 (EP,KR,US);
C07C2601/16 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C249/02, C07C251/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, PT, SE [2000/35] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON CHINONDIIMINEN AUS PHENYLENDIAMINEN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES HYPOCHLORITES ALS OXIDATIONSMITTEL | [2000/35] | English: | PREPARATION OF QUINONEDIIMINES FROM PHENYLENEDIAMINES USING A HYPOCHLORITE AS AN OXIDATION AGENT | [2000/35] | French: | PREPARATION DE QUINONEDIIMINES A PARTIR DE PHENYLENEDIAMINES UTILISANT UN HYPOCHLORITE COMME AGENT D'OXYDATION | [2000/35] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2000 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/35] | 15.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.09.2002 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 16.10.2002 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 07.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - EUGEN MÜLLER AND OTTO BAYER, Methoden der Organischen Chemie (Houben-Weyl) Vol. VII/3b, HOUBEN-WEYL METHODEN DER ORGANISCHEN CHEMIE,DE,GEORGE THIEME VERLAG, STUTTGART, VOL. VII/3B, NR. 2, PAGE(S), XP002148507 [X] 1-10 * page 262 - page 266 * | International search | [Y]US5118807 (WHEELER EDWARD L [US]); | [Y]EP0708080 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]); | [X] - STN CAPLUS, (19000101), Database accession no. 1973-83602, XP002916931 |