EP1040202 - DNA POLYMORPHISM IDENTITY DETERMINATION USING FLOW CYTOMETRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Los Alamos National Security, LLC Los Alamos National Laboratory LC/IP, MS A187 Los Alamos, NM 87545 / US | [2008/31] |
Former [2006/29] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California Los Alamos National Laboratory, LC/IP, MS A187 Los Alamos, NM 87545 / US | ||
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states The Regents of The University of California Los Alamos National Laboratory, LCP/BPL, MS D412, P.O. Box 1663 Los Alamos, NM 87545 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOLAN, John, P. 11 Bundy Road Santa Fe, NM 87501 / US | 02 /
WHITE, P., Scott 2942 A Orange Street Los Alamos, NM 87544 / US | 03 /
CAI, Hong 1997 Cumbres Patio Los Alamos, NM 87544 / US | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | Capasso, Olga, et al de Simone & Partners Via Vincenzo Bellini, 20 00198 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/29] | Capasso, Olga, et al de Simone & Partners Via Vincenzo Bellini, 20 00198 Roma / IT | ||
Former [2000/40] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98955222.9 | 28.10.1998 | [2000/40] | WO1998US23143 | Priority number, date | US19970063685 | 28.10.1997 Original published format: US 63685 | [2000/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9922030 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1040202 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1040202 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1040202 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.05.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C07H21/02, C07H21/04, C12N15/00 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6827 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6816 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6834 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6855 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6862 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6869 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6816, C12Q2565/626, C12Q2565/519, C12Q2533/107 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6827, C12Q2565/626, C12Q2563/131 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6834, C12Q2565/626, C12Q2565/519, C12Q2533/107 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6855, C12Q2537/143, C12Q2535/125 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6862, C12Q2537/143, C12Q2535/125 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2565/626, C12Q2563/155, C12Q2563/131 (EP,US) (-) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/40] | Title | German: | IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON DNA-POLYMORPHISMEN MITTELS DURCHFLUSSZYTOMETRIE | [2000/40] | English: | DNA POLYMORPHISM IDENTITY DETERMINATION USING FLOW CYTOMETRY | [2000/40] | French: | IDENTIFICATION DE POLYMORPHISMES DE L' ADN PAR CYTOMETRIE DE FLUX | [2008/04] |
Former [2000/40] | IDENTIFICATION DU POLYMORPHISME ADN PAR LA CYTOMETRIE DE FLUX | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2000 | Search fee paid | 29.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 27.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 20.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08104631.0 / EP2034031 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/50] | Request for further processing for: | 27.09.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 27.09.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.10.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.12.2008 | GR | 01.04.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/25] | GR | 01.04.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4962037 (JETT JAMES H [US], et al) [Y] 6,7 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9606950 (CHIRON CORP [US]) [Y] 7 * page 3 - page 4 *; | [Y]US5512439 (HORNES ERIK [NO], et al) [Y] 7 * column 4, paragraph 6 *; | [Y]WO9714028 (LUMINEX CORP [US], et al) [Y] 5 * claims 75-77 * * page 91, paragraph 3 * * page 11, paragraph 3 *; | [XY]US5670325 (LAPIDUS STANLEY N [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * claim 38 * * column 5, line 58 - line 63 * * column 6, line 1 - line 26 * * column 16, line 37 - line 66 * * column 17, line 4 - line 28 * [Y] 5-10; | [T] - GOOGLE, (19950404) [T] * the whole document * | [Y] - FULTON R J ET AL, "Advanced multiplexd analysis with the FlowMetrix(TM) system", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CLINICAL CHEMISTRY. WINSTON, US, (199709), vol. 43, no. 9, ISSN 0009-9147, pages 1749 - 1756, XP002142645 [Y] 5 * page 1751, column 2, paragraph 3 * | [Y] - ROBERTS CHRISTOPHER ET AL, "Synthesis of oligonucleotides bearing the non-standard bases iso-C and iso-G. Comparison of iso-C-iso-G, C-G and U-A base-pair stabilities in RNA/DNA duplexes", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1995), vol. 36, no. 21, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 3601 - 3604, XP002285148 [Y] 7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4039(95)00603-A | [Y] - EGGERDING F A ET AL, "FLUORESCENCE-BASED OLIGONUCLEOTIDE LIGATION ASSAY FOR ANALYSIS OF CYSTIC FIBROSIS TRANSMEMBRANE CONDUCTANCE REGULATOR GENE MUTATIONS", HUMAN MUTATION, WILEY-LISS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (1995), vol. 5, no. 2, ISSN 1059-7794, pages 153 - 165, XP001095324 [Y] 8-10 * page 155; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/humu.1380050209 | [Y] - BARON H ET AL, "OLIGONUCLEOTIDE LIGATON ASSAY (OLA) FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF FAMILIAL HYPERCHOLESTEROLEMIA", BIO/TECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING CO. NEW YORK, US, (199610), vol. 14, no. 10, ISSN 0733-222X, pages 1279 - 1282, XP001153081 [Y] 8-10 * page 1279; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1096-1279 | [A] - PASTINEN T ET AL, "Multiplex, fluorescent, solid-phase minisequencing for efficient screening of DNA sequence variation", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY. PRINCIPLES AND TECHNICS, NEW YORK, HARPER & ROW, US, (1974), pages 1391 - 1397, XP002116875 [A] * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4770992 (VAN DEN ENGH GERRIT J [US], et al); | [Y]US5512439 (HORNES ERIK [NO], et al); | [Y]US5629158 (UHLEN MATHIAS [SE]); | [YP]US5736330 (FULTON R JERROLD [US]); | [Y] - LANDEGREN U., ET AL., "A LIGASE-MEDIATED GENE DETECTION TECHNIQUE.", Science, American Association for the Advancement of Science, US, US, (19880826), vol. 241., doi:10.1126/science.3413476, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1077 - 1080., XP002916197 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.3413476 | [Y] - UGOZZOLI L., ET AL., "DETECTION OF SPECIFIC ALLELES BY USING ALLELE-SPECIFIC PRIMER EXTENSION FOLLOWED BY CAPTURE ON SOLID SUPPORT.", GENETIC ANALYSIS: BIOMOLECULAR ENGINEERING., ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHING., US, US, (19920101), vol. 09., no. 04., doi:10.1016/1050-3862(92)90049-B, ISSN 1050-3862, pages 107 - 112., XP002916198 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/1050-3862(92)90049-B | [Y] - BAINS M. A., ET AL., "FLOW CYTOMETRIC QUANTITATION OF SEQUENCE-SPECIFIC MRNA IN HEMOPOIETIC CELL SUSPENSIONS BY PRIMER-INDUCED IN SITU (PRINS) FLUORESCENT NUCLEOTIDE LABELING.", EXPERIMENTAL CELL RESEARCH, ACADEMIC PRESS, US, US, (19930101), vol. 208., no. 01., doi:10.1006/excr.1993.1252, ISSN 0014-4827, pages 321 - 326., XP002916199 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/excr.1993.1252 | [Y] - VLIEGER A. M., ET AL., "QUANTITATION OF POLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION PRODUCTS BY HYBRIDIZATION-BASED ASSAYS WITH FLUORESCENT, COLORIMETRIC, OR CHEMILUMINESCENT DETECTION.", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY., ACADEMIC PRESS INC., NEW YORK., NEW YORK., (19920815), vol. 205., no. 01., doi:10.1016/0003-2697(92)90570-W, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 01 - 07., XP002916200 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-2697(92)90570-W | [XP] - NOLAN J. P., ET AL., "MICROSPHERE-BASED ASSAYS FOR GENOME ANALYSIS USING FLOW CYTOMETRY.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HUMAN GENETICS, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HUMAN GENETICS, CHICAGO, IL., US, US, (19971028), ISSN 0002-9297, page COMPLETE 01., XP002916301 |