EP1029008 - USE OF DIOL ALKOXYLATES AS ADDITIVES FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PIGMENT CONCENTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2002 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2000/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULTE, Heinz-Günther Winsterstrasse 66 D-45481 Mülheim / DE | 02 /
HÖFER, Rainer Klever Strasse 31 D-40477 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
RATHS, Hans-Christian Nelly-Sachs-Strasse 13 D-40789 Monheim / DE | 04 /
FROMMELIUS, Harald Seefelderweg 2 D-40789 Monheim / DE | 05 /
GOLLNICK, Stefan Uhlandstrasse 12 D-41464 Neuss / DE | [2000/34] | Application number, filing date | 98955521.4 | 24.10.1998 | [2000/34] | WO1998EP06766 | Priority number, date | DE1997148576 | 04.11.1997 Original published format: DE 19748576 | [2000/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9923184 | Date: | 14.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1029008 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1029008 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C09D17/00, C09B67/00, // B01F17:00 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
C09D17/001 (EP,US);
C09B67/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/34] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON DIOLALKOXYLATEN ALS ADDITIVE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PIGMENTKONZENTRATEN | [2000/34] | English: | USE OF DIOL ALKOXYLATES AS ADDITIVES FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PIGMENT CONCENTRATES | [2000/34] | French: | UTILISATION DE DIOLALCOXYLATES EN TANT QU'ADDITIFS POUR LA PREPARATION DE CONCENTRES DE PIGMENTS | [2000/34] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 14.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0011752 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1,3,6 * abstract * * page 4, line 31 ** page 5, lines 20-21 *; | [A]EP0032188 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * page 9, paragraph 1 *; | [A]EP0585571 (GLIDDEN CO [US]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [AD]EP0735109 (BAYER AG [DE]) [AD] 1-5 * page 2, lines 26-30; claim - *; | [A]US5634971 (BAKER TIMOTHY J [US]) [A] 1-6 * claims 1-7 * |