Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1237599 | Global Dossier | 15.06.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | FI974260 | 17.11.1997 | FI9800897 | 16.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1062795 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FI974260 | 17.11.1997 | FI9800897 | 16.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6430269 | 06.08.2002 | B1 | US2002061097 | 23.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FI974260 | 17.11.1997 | FI9800897 | 16.11.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9927699 | Global Dossier | 29.07.1999 | A3 | WO9927699 | 03.06.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FI974260 | 17.11.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI974260 | 18.05.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | FI974260 | 17.11.1997 |