EP1062795 - METHOD OF TRANSMITTING AN ACKNOWLEDGEMENT TO AN A-SUBSCRIBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states Nokia Networks Oy Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANERVA, Mikko Kaarnatie 1 F 58 FIN-00410 Helsinki / FI | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | Holmström, Stefan Mikael, et al Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | Holmström, Stefan Mikael, et al Oy Kolster Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 98955603.0 | 16.11.1998 | [2000/52] | WO1998FI00897 | Priority number, date | FI19970004260 | 17.11.1997 Original published format: FI 974260 | [2000/52] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9927699 | Date: | 03.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1062795 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 29.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/50, H04M3/42 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0457 (EP,US);
H04M3/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG EINER BESTÄTIGUNG ZU EINEM A-TEILNEHMER | [2000/52] | English: | METHOD OF TRANSMITTING AN ACKNOWLEDGEMENT TO AN A-SUBSCRIBER | [2000/52] | French: | PROCEDE D'EMISSION D'UN ACCUSE DE RECEPTION A DESTINATION D'UN ABONNE A | [2000/52] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.1998 | Translation filed | 08.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 08.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 30.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/47] | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0434239 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]); | [X]US5680447 (DIAMOND ROBERT L [US], et al); | [A]EP0802661 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) |