EP1034209 - AQUEOUS SILICON DISPERSIONS, FORMULATIONS IN PARTICULAR OF PAINTS CONTAINING THEM AND ONE METHOD FOR PREPARING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.01.2005 [2005/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHODIA CHIMIE 25, quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [2000/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARDINAUD, Denis 10, rue Delle F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | 02 /
CHARRUEY, Bruno 6 ter, rue des Martrois F-91580 Etrechy / FR | 03 /
STREET, Georges, Christopher Les Trois Cèdres F-69110 Sainte Foy-les-Lyon / FR | 04 /
PAILLET, Jean-Pierre 39, rue de la Mairie F-69320 Feyzin / FR | [2000/37] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2001/47] |
Former [2000/37] | Dubruc, Philippe RHODIA SERVICES Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 25, quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 98955675.8 | 17.11.1998 | [2000/37] | WO1998FR02449 | Priority number, date | FR19970014681 | 18.11.1997 Original published format: FR 9714681 | [2000/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9925757 | Date: | 27.05.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1034209 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1034209 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/03, C08L83/04 | [2000/37] | CPC: |
C08J3/03 (EP);
C08L83/04 (EP);
C08G77/045 (EP);
C08G77/16 (EP);
C08G77/80 (EP);
C08J2383/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L83/04, C08L83/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/37] | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE SILIKONDISPERSIONEN, DIESE ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, INSBESONDERE FARBEN, UND EIN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2000/37] | English: | AQUEOUS SILICON DISPERSIONS, FORMULATIONS IN PARTICULAR OF PAINTS CONTAINING THEM AND ONE METHOD FOR PREPARING THEM | [2000/37] | French: | DISPERSIONS SILICONES AQUEUSES, FORMULATIONS NOTAMMENT DE PEINTURES LES COMPRENANT ET L'UN DE LEUR PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | [2000/37] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/37] | 19.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.01.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4554187 (GRAPE WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [DA] 1* claims 1-10 *; | [X]EP0572006 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * claims 1-10 * * page 3, line 6 - page 7, line 52 *; | [DA]WO9608529 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR], et al) [DA] 1 * claims 1-21 *; | [X]EP0738747 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * claims 1-12 * * page 3, line 16 - line 35 * * page 3, line 41 - page 4, line 11 * * page 4, line 20 - line 22 * * page 4, line 23 - page 7, line 37 *; | [DE]FR2753708 (RHODIA CHIMIE SA [FR]) [DE] 1 * claims 1-13 * * page 11, line 27 - page 12, line 13 * * page 12, line 18 - page 16, line 25 * * page 17, line 12 - line 22 * * page 17, line 27 - page 18, line 25 * * page 19, line 25 - page 20, line 14 * |