EP1032545 - HYDRATION MODIFYING AGENT FOR MORTAR OR CONCRETE WITH LIMITED SHRINKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VICAT Tour Manhattan, 6 place de l'Iris 92095 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states VICAT Tour Manhattan, 6 place de l'Iris 92095 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2000/36] | For all designated states VICAT 24eme Etage, Tour Gan CB 21 F-92082 Courbevoie Paris-La Défence Cédex 13 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CECCALDI, Jean-Dominique Quartier des Plattes F-26220 Dieulefit / FR | 02 /
IZORET, Laurent 21, place Tolozan F-69001 Lyon / FR | [2000/36] | Representative(s) | Guerre, Dominique Cabinet Germain et Maureau 12 Rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | Guerre, Dominique Cabinet Germain et Maureau, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 98955677.4 | 17.11.1998 | [2000/36] | WO1998FR02451 | Priority number, date | FR19970014593 | 17.11.1997 Original published format: FR 9714593 | [2000/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9925664 | Date: | 27.05.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1032545 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1032545 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/02, // (C04B28/02, 22:14, 24:12), C04B24:32 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
C04B28/02 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00146 (EP,US);
C04B2111/26 (EP,US);
C04B2111/34 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/02, C04B11/05, C04B14/06, C04B24/023, C04B24/023, C04B24/124, C04B2103/0082, C04B2103/30, C04B2103/304, C04B2103/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/36] | Title | German: | HYDRATATIONSMODIFIZIERUNGSMITTEL FÜR MÖRTEL ODER BETON MIT LIMITIERTER SCHWINDUNG | [2000/36] | English: | HYDRATION MODIFYING AGENT FOR MORTAR OR CONCRETE WITH LIMITED SHRINKAGE | [2000/36] | French: | AGENT MODIFICATEUR D'HYDRATATION POUR MORTIER OU BETON A RETRAIT LIMITE | [2000/36] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/36] | 14.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 08.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02] | Request for further processing for: | 11.02.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 11.02.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.03.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | HU31035 [ ]; | JPH05973465 [ ]; | [A]US4447269 (SCHREUDERS HANS G [US], et al) [A] 1* column 6, line 29 - line 40 *; | [A]EP0238858 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *; | JPH01103944 [ ] (OSAKA CEMENT); | [A]EP0350904 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0403974 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0518156 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1,11 * claims 1-3,11 *; | [A]WO9627565 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [A] - I. FEUER, "floor-equalizing dry self-spreading mortar with decreased shrinkage", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19891127), vol. 111, no. 22, Database accession no. 197133d, XP000061179 [A] 1,7 * abstract * | [A] - ANDO YUTAKA, "concrete compositions for centrifugal molding", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19891127), vol. 111, no. 22, Database accession no. 200687b, XP000156470 [A] 1,7 * abstract * | [A] - DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO, "water-reducing agents for concrete", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19841001), vol. 101, no. 14, Database accession no. 115828x, XP000061197 [A] 1,7 * abstract * |