EP1032702 - REAGENTS AND METHODS FOR DETECTING GENES RELATED TO MAJOR HISTOCOMPATIBILITY COMPLEX OF DOMESTIC FOWL, SUCH AS CHICKEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2006 | Refusal of application | published on 19.04.2006 [2006/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE AGRONOMIQUE 145, rue de l'Université F-75341 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE 3 rue Michel Ange 75794 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | ||
For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE AGRONOMIQUE 145, rue de l'Université F-75341 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZOOROB, Rima 30, chemin de la Croix Biches F-93160 Noisy-le-Grand / FR | 02 /
AUFFRAY, Charles 6, rue du Clos Bourgoin F-94370 Sucy-en-Brie / FR | 03 /
CHAUSSEE, Anne-Marie L'Aître Barbier F-37380 Saint Laurent en Gatines / FR | [2000/36] | Representative(s) | Peaucelle, Chantal, et al Cabinet Armengaud Aîné 3, Avenue Bugeaud 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | Peaucelle, Chantal, et al Cabinet Armengaud Aine 3, avenue Bugeaud 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98955723.6 | 23.11.1998 | [2000/36] | WO1998FR02501 | Priority number, date | FR19970014669 | 21.11.1997 Original published format: FR 9714669 | [2000/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9927132 | Date: | 03.06.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1032702 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6881 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6827 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6869 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/36] | Title | German: | REAGENTIEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG VON MHC GENEN AUS ZUCHTVÖGELN WIE Z.B. AUS HÜHNERN | [2000/36] | English: | REAGENTS AND METHODS FOR DETECTING GENES RELATED TO MAJOR HISTOCOMPATIBILITY COMPLEX OF DOMESTIC FOWL, SUCH AS CHICKEN | [2000/36] | French: | REACTIFS ET METHODES POUR LA DETECTION DE GENES LIES AU COMPLEXE MAJEUR D'HISTOCOMPATIBILITE D'OISEAUX D'ELEVAGE, TELS QUE LE POULET | [2000/36] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/36] | 28.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2005 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.10.2005 | 25.10.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.10.2005 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/16] | 25.11.2005 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/16] | Divisional application(s) | EP04011368.0 / EP1566450 | Request for further processing for: | 12.05.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 13.05.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.05.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - GUILLEMOT F. ET AL.,, "Physical linkage of a guanine nucleotide-binding protein-related gene to the chicken major histocompatibility complex", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, vol. 86, pages 4594 - 4598, XP002074404 [X] 1 * le document en entier, esp. discussion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.86.12.4594 | [X] - GUILLEMOT F. ET AL.,, "A molecular map of the chicken major histocompatibility complex: the class II beta genes are closely linked to the class I genes and the nucleolar organizer", THE EMBO JOURNAL, vol. 7, no. 9, pages 2775 - 2785, XP002074405 [X] 1 * le document en entier, esp. figure 1 et page 2783, 2. colonne * | [Y] - MILLER M. M. ET AL.,, "Regions of homology shared by Rftp-Y and major histocompatibility B complex genes", IMMUNOGENETICS, vol. 39, pages 71 - 73, XP002074406 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00171802 | [Y] - WAKENELL P. S. ET AL.,, "Association between the Rfp-Y haplotype and the incidence of Marek's disease in chicken", IMMUNOGENETICS, vol. 44, pages 242 - 245, XP002074407 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002510050119 | [X] - BERNOT A. ET AL.,, "Linkage of a new member of the lectin supergene family to chicken MHC genes", IMMUNOGENETICS, vol. 39, pages 221 - 229, XP002100550 [X] 7-10 * voir le doc. en entier, esp. p.221, col. 1; p.222 col.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00188784 | [X] - ZOOROB R. ET AL.,, "Chicken major histocompatibility complex class II B genes: analysis of interallelic and interlocus sequence variance", EUR. J. IMMUNOL., vol. 23, pages 1139 - 1145, XP002074408 [X] 7-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/eji.1830230524 | [A] - VALLEJO R.L. ET AL.,, "Non-association between Rfp-Y major histocompatibility complex-like genes and susceptibility to Marek's disease virus induced tumours in 6.3x7.2 intercross chickens", ANIMAL GENETICS, vol. 28, pages 331 - 337, XP002074409 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2052.1997.00178.x | [A] - KAUFMAN J. ET AL.,, "Different features of the MHC class I heterodimer have evolved at different rates", J. IMMUNOLOGY, vol. 148, pages 1532 - 1546, XP002074410 [A] * the whole document * |