EP1034175 - SUBSTITUTED PHENYLOXAZOLIDINONES AND THEIR USE AS ANTIBIOTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca UK Limited 15 Stanhope Gate London W1Y 6LN / GB | [2000/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BETTS, Michael John Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 02 /
SWAIN, Michael Lingard Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | [2000/37] | Representative(s) | Berry, Ian Gordon AstraZeneca PLC Global Intellectual Property Mereside Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | Berry, Ian Gordon AstraZeneca PLC Global Intellectual Property Mereside Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | Application number, filing date | 98955759.0 | 24.11.1998 | [2000/37] | WO1998GB03496 | Priority number, date | GB19970025244 | 29.11.1997 Original published format: GB 9725244 | [2000/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9928317 | Date: | 10.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1034175 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/14, C07D417/14, A61K31/42, C07D413/10 | [2000/37] | CPC: |
C07D413/10 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07D413/14 (EP,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/37] | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE PHENYLOXAZOLIDINONE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS ANITIBIOTIKA | [2000/37] | English: | SUBSTITUTED PHENYLOXAZOLIDINONES AND THEIR USE AS ANTIBIOTICS | [2000/37] | French: | PHENYLOXAZOLIDINONES SUBSTITUEES ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QU'ANTIBIOTIQUES | [2000/37] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/37] | 18.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/06] | 03.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9731917 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-9 * claim - *; | [Y]WO9623788 (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * claim - *; | [Y]EP0352781 (DU PONT [US]) [Y] 1-9 * claim - *; | [Y]WO9309103 (UPJOHN CO [US]) [Y] 1-9 * page 8, line 26 - page 9, line 26; claim - *; | [Y]WO9507271 (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * claim - * |