EP1038063 - PROCESSES FOR COATING SEWING THREAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J. & P. Coats, Limited 155 St. Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5PA Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states J. & P. Coats, Limited 155 St. Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5PA Scotland / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROOME, Gordon, H. 105 Addington Way Toccoa, GA 30577 / US | 02 /
POWELL, J., Keith 120 Foxdale Drive Toccoa, GA 30577 / US | 03 /
JIN, Yanda 315 Wesley Circle Toccoa, GA 30577 / US | 04 /
DeFOOR, Patricia, W. 108 Robin Circle Toccoa, GA 30577 / US | [2000/39] | Representative(s) | McNeight, David Leslie, et al Hill Dickinson Solicitors 50 Fountain Street Manchester M2 2AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/07] | McNeight, David Leslie, et al Hill Dickinson 50 Fountain Street Manchester M2 2AS / GB | ||
Former [2000/39] | McNeight, David Leslie, et al McNeight & Lawrence Regent House Heaton Lane Stockport Cheshire SK4 1BS / GB | Application number, filing date | 98955770.7 | 25.11.1998 | [2000/39] | WO1998GB03508 | Priority number, date | US19970987655 | 09.12.1997 Original published format: US 987655 | [2000/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9929956 | Date: | 17.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1038063 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D06M10/10, D06M15/705, D06M15/55 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
D02G3/46 (EP,US);
D02G3/404 (EP,US);
D06B3/045 (EP,US);
D06M10/001 (EP,US);
D06M10/10 (EP,US);
D06M14/18 (EP,US);
D06M15/55 (EP,US);
D06P1/44 (EP,US);
D06P5/2005 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESCHICHTUNG EINES NÄHGARNES | [2000/39] | English: | PROCESSES FOR COATING SEWING THREAD | [2000/39] | French: | PROCEDES D'ENDUCTION DE FIL A COUDRE | [2000/39] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 10.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2875092 (TERRY CLINE EDWARD) [X] 1-9 * column 1, line 15 - column 4, line 67; claim - * [Y] 11,12,14-19; | [X]USRE25164E (CLINE) [X] 1-9 * claim - *; | [X]FR1300057 (HEBERLEIN & CO AG) [X] 1-10 * page 2, column L, line 24 - line 32; claim - *; | [X]GB917437 (HEBERLEIN & CO AG) [X] 1-9 * page 1, line 51 - page 2, line 123; claim - *; | [Y]FR1435755 (HÖNNINGSTAD ET AL.) [Y] 11,12,14-19 * page 3, column R, line 32 - page 5, column R, line 58; figure -; claim - *; | [A]FR2031719 (VERRE TEXTILE STE) [A] 1* figure -; claim - * |