blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0975345

EP0975345 - (-)-MEFLOQUINE TO BLOCK PURINERGIC RECEPTORS AND TO TREAT MOVEMENT OR NEURODEGENERATIVE DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.06.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.07.2004  [2004/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VERNALIS RESEARCH LIMITED
Oakdene Court, 613 Reading Road Winnersh
Wokingham RG41 5UA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
VERNALIS RESEARCH LIMITED
Oakdene Court, 613 Reading Road
Winnersh, Wokingham RG41 5UA / GB
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Cerebrus Pharmaceuticals Limited
Oakdene Court, 613 Reading Road
Winnersh, Wokingham RG41 5UA / GB
Inventor(s)01 / SHEPHERD, Robin
deceased / GB
02 / FLETCHER, Allan
59 The Granary
Wynyard Village, Cleveland TS22 5QG / GB
03 / KNUTSEN, Lars Jacob Stray
6 Waylands Close, Bradfield
Reading, Berkshire RG7 6AG / GB
04 / PORTER, Richard H. P.
17 Sycamore Road
Chalfont St.Giles, Bucks HP8 4LE / GB
05 / WEISS, Scott Murray
9 Lindsey Close
Wokingham, Berkshire RG41 3AW / GB
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Howard, Paul Nicholas, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Howard, Paul Nicholas, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date98955789.726.11.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998GB03536
Priority number, dateGB1997002504926.11.1997         Original published format: GB 9725049
GB1998001938504.09.1998         Original published format: GB 9819385
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9926627
Date:03.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975345
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.06.1999
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/47, A61P25/16, A61P25/28, A61P25/14
[2003/33]
CPC:
A61K31/4709 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/05]A61K31/47
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:(-)-MEFLOQUINE ZUR BLOCKIERUNG DER PURINREZEPTOREN UND ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON BEWEGUNG- ODER NEURODEGENERATIVEN ERKRANKUNGEN[2000/05]
English:(-)-MEFLOQUINE TO BLOCK PURINERGIC RECEPTORS AND TO TREAT MOVEMENT OR NEURODEGENERATIVE DISORDERS[2000/05]
French:(-)-MEFLOQUINE UTILISEE POUR LE BLOCAGE DE RECEPTEURS PURINERGIQUES ET POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE DESORDRES NEURODEGENERATIF ET DES MOUVEMENTS[2003/36]
Former [2000/05](-)-MEFLOQUINE UTILISEE POUR LE BLOCAGE DE RECEPTEURS PURINERGIQUES ET POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE PERTURBATIONS NEURODEGENERATIVES ET DES MOUVEMENTS
Entry into regional phase28.07.1999National basic fee paid 
28.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
28.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/31]
23.02.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200003   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2001
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[PX]WO9839003  (CEREBRUS LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1-8,12,15 * page 2 * * page 4, line 1 - line 11 * * page 7, line 9 - line 15 * * page 8, line 12 - line 15 * * page 9, line 16 - line 37 * * page 18 - page 23 *;
 [A]  - EMERY ET AL., "Arylmethanol and thiosemicarbazone influence on Plasmodial macromolecular synthesis and cell stability", LIFE SCI., (1983), vol. 33, no. 13, pages 1285 - 1294, XP002054347 [A] 1-5 * page 1292 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0024-3205(83)90010-3
 [A]  - LITMAN ET AL., "Structure-activity relationships of P-glycoprotein interacting drugs: kinetic characterization of their effects on ATPase activity", BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1997), vol. 1361, no. 2, pages 159 - 163, XP002054348 [A] 1-4 * page 162; figure 5 * * page 164; table 1 * * page 165; figure 9 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-4439(97)00026-4
 [A]  - BESSER ET AL., "Verdacht auf anfallfördernde Wirkung von Mefloquine (Lariam(R))", NERVENARZT, (1991), vol. 62, no. 12, pages 760 - 761, XP002054349 [A] 5-7,11,12 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - NGIAM ET AL., "Stereospecific inhibition of cholinesterases by mefloquine", CHEM. PHARM. BULL., (1987), vol. 35, no. 1, pages 409 - 412, XP002093900 [Y] 6,7,11,16-20 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - GOODMAN-GILMAN ET AL., The pharmacological basis of therapeutics, NEW YORK, USA, MACMILLAN PUBLISHING COMPANY, (1987), XP002093901 [Y] 6,7,11,16-20 * page 125 - page 127 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.