EP1029363 - A SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE OF SiC AND A TRANSISTOR OF SiC HAVING AN INSULATED GATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.05.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cree, Inc. 4600 Silicon Drive Durham, NC 27703 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states CREE, INC. 4600 Silicon Drive Durham, NC 27703 / US | ||
Former [2000/34] | For all designated states ABB RESEARCH LTD. P.O. Box 8131 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIJLENGA, Bo kestavägen 7 S-730 50 Skultuna / SE | 02 /
ZDANSKY, Lennart Vegagatan 6d S-722 23 Väster s / SE | 03 /
HARRIS, Christopher Organistgränd 34 S-191 72 Sollentuna / SE | 04 /
BAKOWSKI, Mietek Blomstervägen 3 S-151 60 Södertälje / SE | 05 /
KONSTANTINOV, Andrey Snapphanevägen 130 S-175 23 Järfälla / SE | 06 /
GUSTAFSSON, Ulf Ekholmsvägen 84 A S-582 61 Linköping / SE | [2000/34] | Representative(s) | Olsson, Jan, et al Bjerkéns Patentbyrå KB P.O.Box 1274 801 37 Gävle / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | Olsson, Jan, et al Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB P.O.Box 1274 801 37 Gävle / SE | Application number, filing date | 98956064.4 | 13.11.1998 | [2000/34] | WO1998SE02048 | Priority number, date | SE19970004149 | 13.11.1997 Original published format: SE 9704149 | [2000/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9926296 | Date: | 27.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1029363 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/78, H01L29/24 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
H01L29/7802 (EP,US);
H01L29/0623 (EP,US);
H01L29/0634 (EP,US);
H01L29/1608 (EP,US);
H01L29/66068 (EP,US);
H01L29/7395 (EP,US);
H01L29/7813 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2000/34] | Title | German: | SIC HALBLEITERANORDNUNG UND SIC TRANSISTOR MIT ISOLIERTER STEUERELEKTRODE | [2000/34] | English: | A SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE OF SiC AND A TRANSISTOR OF SiC HAVING AN INSULATED GATE | [2000/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF SEMICONDUCTEUR AU SiC ET TRANSISTOR SiC A GRILLE ISOLEE | [2000/34] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 17.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 14.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/23] | 03.07.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.05.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/23] | Appeal following examination | 03.09.2009 | Appeal received No. T2470/09 | 16.04.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant inadmissible | Divisional application(s) | EP09174562.0 / EP2144277 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4151540 (SANDER WENDELL B [US], et al); | [A]US4379726 (KUMAMARU KUNIAKI [JP], et al); | [A]US4984049 (NISHIZAWA JUN-ICHI [JP], et al); | [A]US5223737 (CANCLINI ATHOS [IT]); | [X]US5514608 (WILLIAMS RICHARD K [US], et al); | [A]US5681762 (BALIGA BANTVAL JAYANT [US]) |