EP1025702 - RAIN SENSOR WITH FOG DISCRIMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DONNELLY CORPORATION 414 East Fortieth Street Holland, Michigan 49423 / US | [2006/44] |
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states DONNELLY CORPORATION 414 East Fortieth Street Holland Michigan 49423 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOFIELD, Kenneth 4793 Crestridge Court Holland, MI 49423 / US | 02 /
LARSON, Mark, L. 10500 Stump Street Grand Haven, MI 49417 / US | 03 /
BOS, Brent, J. Apartment 1 4234 E. Monte Vista Tucson, AZ 85712 / US | 04 /
LYNAM, Niall, R. 281 Norwood Avenue Holland, MI 49424 / US | [2006/41] |
Former [2000/32] | 01 /
SCHOFIELD, Kenneth 4793 Crestridge Court Holland, MI 49423 / US | ||
02 /
LARSON, Mark, L. 13783 Oakwood Circle Grand Haven, MI 49417 / US | |||
03 /
BOS, Brent, J. Apartment 1 4234 E. Monte Vista Tucson, AZ 85712 / US | |||
04 /
LYNAM, Niall, R. 248 Foxdown Holland, MI 49424 / US | Representative(s) | Coyle, Philip Aidan FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | Coyle, Philip Aidan F. R. KELLY & CO. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 98956367.1 | 30.10.1998 | [2000/32] | WO1998US23062 | Priority number, date | US19970064335P | 30.10.1997 Original published format: US 64335 P | [2000/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9923828 | Date: | 14.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1025702 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1025702 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1025702 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.05.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/18, B60S1/08 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
B60H1/00785 (EP,US);
B60N2/002 (EP,US);
B60S1/0822 (EP,US);
B60S1/0844 (EP,US);
B60S1/0888 (EP,US);
G06V20/56 (EP,US);
B60N2210/24 (EP);
B60R2001/1223 (EP,US);
B60S1/0833 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/32] | H04N7/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [2000/32] | Title | German: | REGENSENSOR MIT NEBELERKENNUNG | [2000/32] | English: | RAIN SENSOR WITH FOG DISCRIMINATION | [2000/32] | French: | DETECTEUR DE PLUIE DISTINGUANT LA PLUIE DE LA BUEE | [2000/32] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2000 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 02.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 02.02.2007 | ES | 13.02.2007 | [2007/29] |
Former [2007/21] | ES | 13.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5313072 (VACHSS FREDERICK [US]); | [E]WO9914088 (GENTEX CORP [US]) | International search | [Y]US4867561 (FUJII TETSUO [JP], et al); | [Y]US5059877 (TEDER REIN S [US]); | [Y]US5329206 (SLOTKOWSKI KENNETH G [US], et al); | [X]US5336980 (LEVERS JUERGEN [DE]) |