11.12.2009 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] |
01.12.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.08.2009 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
13.03.2009 |
First examination report |
|
11.03.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.11.2008 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] |
11.11.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.10.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.10.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.09.2007 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] |
14.09.2007 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] |
25.10.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.10.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.10.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.02.2004 |
Change - applicant |
published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] |
25.10.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.10.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.11.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
31.10.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.06.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.08.2000 [2000/33] |
30.06.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.08.2000 [2000/33] |
14.06.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.06.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.06.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.07.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.05.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.05.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.12.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|