EP1027751 - DIGITALLY CONTROLLED MONOLITHIC MICROWAVE INTEGRATED CIRCUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAYTHEON COMPANY 870 Winter Street Waltham MA 02451-1449 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states Raytheon Company 870 Winter Street Waltham, Massachusetts 02451-1449 / US | ||
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states RAYTHEON COMPANY 141 Spring Street Lexington, Massachusetts 02173 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Irl, W. 537 Hayward Mill Road Concord, MA 01742 / US | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Jackson, David Spence Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | Jackson, David Spence REDDIE & GROSE 16, Theobalds Road London, WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98956504.9 | 03.11.1998 | [2000/33] | WO1998US23367 | Priority number, date | US19970963453 | 03.11.1997 Original published format: US 963453 | US19970963562 | 03.11.1997 Original published format: US 963562 | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9923717 | Date: | 14.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1027751 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.05.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q21/00, H01P1/15 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
H01Q21/0025 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/33] | H01Q3/22, H01Q3/24, H01Q3/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/33] | Title | German: | DIGITAL GESTEUERTE MONOLITHISCH INTEGRIERTE MIKROWELLENSCHALTUNGEN | [2000/33] | English: | DIGITALLY CONTROLLED MONOLITHIC MICROWAVE INTEGRATED CIRCUITS | [2000/33] | French: | CIRCUITS INTEGRES MONOLITHIQUES HYPERFREQUENCE A COMMANDE NUMERIQUE | [2000/33] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2000 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 16.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/02] | 31.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5585288 (DAVIS SUSAN E ET AL) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5412414 (AST HARRY C ET AL) [Y] 1,4,5,7,10,11 * column 5, line 30 - column 8, line 23 * * column 14, line 51 - column 15, line 37 * * column 16, line 19 - line 53 * * figures 1,4-9 * * abstract *; | [XY]US4638190 (CHEN YOUNG K ET AL) [X] 6,12,15 * column 8, line 6 - column 9, line 68 * * figures 4,5a,5b * * abstract * [Y] 1,4,5,7,10,11; | [X]US4967201 (RICH III EDWARD L) [X] 1,2,5,7,12 * column 3, line 35 - column 5, line 3 * * figures 1,6 * * abstract *; | [X]US5093667 (ANDRICOS CONSTANTINE) [X] 1,6,12,15 * column 5, line 41 - column 6, line 48 * * column 9, line 16 - column 11, line 34 * * column 20, line 10 - line 33 * * figures 2,7-9,21 * * abstract * | International search | [Y]US5412414 ; | [Y]US4945360 ; | [Y]US4967201 ; | [Y]US5093667 |