EP1016199 - STATOR FOR AN ELECTRIC MOTOR, INCLUDING FOR A BRUSHLESS DIRECT CURRENT MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.07.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Automotive Electronics & Components GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 2-8 78315 Radolfzell / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states TRW Automotive Electronics & Components GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 2-8 78315 Radolfzell / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Jürgen Kasernenstrasse 51 D-78315 Radolfzell / DE | 02 /
PETER, Cornelius Traubenweg 3 D-77815 Brühl / DE | 03 /
WILKENDORF, Hardy Hinterm Forsthaus 6 D-88696 Owingen / DE | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Eder, Thomas Eder Schieschke & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Elisabethstrasse 34/II 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | Eder, Thomas (DE) Eder & Schieschke Patentanwälte, Elisabethstrasse 34/II 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98956772.2 | 15.09.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998DE02738 | Priority number, date | DE19971040938 | 17.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19740938 | [2000/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9914841 | Date: | 25.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1016199 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1016199 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H02K29/00, H02K3/52 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
H02K11/33 (EP);
H02K15/02 (KR);
H02K3/522 (EP);
H02K2203/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/27] | Title | German: | STATOR FÜR EINEN ELEKTROMOTOR, INSBESONDERE BÜRSTENLOSEN GLEICHSTROMMOTOR | [2000/27] | English: | STATOR FOR AN ELECTRIC MOTOR, INCLUDING FOR A BRUSHLESS DIRECT CURRENT MOTOR | [2000/27] | French: | STATOR POUR MOTEUR ELECTRIQUE, NOTAMMENT POUR MOTEUR A COURANT CONTINU SANS BALAIS | [2000/27] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 07.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.07.2002
25.09.2002
ADMISSIBLE ebm-papst Mulfingen GmbH & Co. KG Bachmühle 2 74673 Mulfingen / DE Opponent's representative Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- und Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.07.2002
25.09.2002
ADMISSIBLE ebm-papst Mulfingen GmbH & Co. KG Bachmühle 2 74673 Mulfingen / DE Opponent's representative Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.07.2002
ebm Werke GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 1161 74671 Mulfingen / DE Opponent's representative Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | 30.09.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.01.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 08.04.2005 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2005/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 14.11.2001 | SE | 14.02.2002 | ES | 30.05.2002 | [2008/16] |
Former [2004/04] | SE | 14.02.2002 | |
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 14.02.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0064105 (AMP INC [US]) [A] * abstract *; | [A]JPH07107724 ; | [A]JPH08126238 ; | [A]US5175458 (LEMMER JEROME J [US], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950831), vol. 095, no. 007, & JP07107724 A 19950421 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960930), vol. 096, no. 009, & JP08126238 A 19960517 (MITSUMI ELECTRIC CO LTD) |