EP1035904 - METHOD FOR DEHYDRATING A WET GAS USING A LIQUID DESSICANT, WITH ADVANCED REGENERATION OF SAID DESSICANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2003 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prosernat Tour Framatome 92084 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [2000/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANDREAU, Benoit 38 bis, rue Jean Longuet F-92290 Châtenay Malabry / FR | 02 /
AMANDE, Jean-Claude 40, avenue des Prés Vendôme F-78480 Villepreux / FR | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | Benoist, François, et al Institut Français du Pétrole 1 et 4, avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Benoist, François, et al Institut Français du Pétrole 1 et 4, avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | ||
Former [2001/20] | Andréeff, François, et al Département Brevets, Institut Français du Petrole, 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil Malmaison / FR | ||
Former [2000/38] | Brommer, Hans Joachim, Dr.-Ing., et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 11 08 47 76058 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 98956973.6 | 27.11.1998 | [2000/38] | WO1998FR02554 | Priority number, date | FR19970015268 | 02.12.1997 Original published format: FR 9715268 | [2000/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9928014 | Date: | 10.06.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1035904 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1035904 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/26, C10L3/10 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
B01D53/263 (EP,US);
C10L3/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENTWÄSSERUNG EINES FEUCHTEN GASES MITTELS EINER ENTWÄSSERUNGSFLÜSSIGKEIT, MIT TIEFREGENERATION DER ENTWÄSSERUNGSFLÜSSIGKEIT | [2000/38] | English: | METHOD FOR DEHYDRATING A WET GAS USING A LIQUID DESSICANT, WITH ADVANCED REGENERATION OF SAID DESSICANT | [2000/38] | French: | PROCEDE DE DESHYDRATATION D'UN GAZ HUMIDE AU MOYEN D'UN DESSICCANT LIQUIDE, AVEC REGENERATION POUSSEE DUDIT DESSICCANT | [2000/38] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 28.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 20.03.2002 | [2008/16] | Cited in | International search | [DA]US3105748 (WILLI STAHL); | [A]EP0770667 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [A] 1,3,4,6,7,9,14-16 * claims 1-18 * * figures 1,7 * |