EP1035875 - METHOD FOR DECONTAMINATING A HOLLOW NEEDLE AND HOLLOW NEEDLE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/38] | METHOD FOR DECONTAMINATING A HOLLOW NEEDLE | ||
[2002/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIO MERIEUX Chemin de l'Orme 69280 Marcy l'Etoile / FR | [2000/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLIN, Bruno 23, chemin des Garennes F-69280 Marcy l'Etoile / FR | 02 /
PRIVAT, Marie La Boulonnière F-69560 Saint Romain en Gal / FR | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | Guerre, Dominique, et al Cabinet Germain et Maureau 12 Rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | Guerre, Dominique, et al Cabinet Germain et Maureau, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 98956978.5 | 27.11.1998 | [2000/38] | WO1998FR02561 | Priority number, date | FR19970015185 | 27.11.1997 Original published format: FR 9715185 | [2000/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9927973 | Date: | 10.06.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1035875 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1035875 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/04 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
A61L2/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM DEKONTAMINIEREN VON HOHLNADELN UND HOHLNADEL HIERZU | [2002/51] | English: | METHOD FOR DECONTAMINATING A HOLLOW NEEDLE AND HOLLOW NEEDLE THEREFOR | [2002/51] | French: | PROCEDE DE DECONTAMINATION D'UNE AIGUILLE CREUSE ET AIGUILLE CREUSE | [2002/51] |
Former [2000/38] | VERFAHREN ZUM DEKONTAMINIEREN VON HOHLNADELN | ||
Former [2000/38] | METHOD FOR DECONTAMINATING A HOLLOW NEEDLE | ||
Former [2000/38] | PROCEDE DE DECONTAMINATION D'UNE AIGUILLE CREUSE | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 15.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.05.2003 | FI | 14.05.2003 | IE | 14.05.2003 | NL | 14.05.2003 | DK | 14.08.2003 | GR | 14.08.2003 | PT | 14.08.2003 | SE | 14.08.2003 | CY | 27.11.2003 | LU | 27.11.2003 | BE | 30.11.2003 | CH | 30.11.2003 | LI | 30.11.2003 | MC | 30.11.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2005/01] | AT | 14.05.2003 | |
FI | 14.05.2003 | ||
IE | 14.05.2003 | ||
NL | 14.05.2003 | ||
DK | 14.08.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
CY | 27.11.2003 | ||
LU | 27.11.2003 | ||
BE | 30.11.2003 | ||
CH | 30.11.2003 | ||
LI | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 14.05.2003 | |
FI | 14.05.2003 | ||
IE | 14.05.2003 | ||
NL | 14.05.2003 | ||
DK | 14.08.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
CY | 27.11.2003 | ||
LU | 27.11.2003 | ||
CH | 30.11.2003 | ||
LI | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 14.05.2003 | |
FI | 14.05.2003 | ||
IE | 14.05.2003 | ||
NL | 14.05.2003 | ||
DK | 14.08.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
CY | 27.11.2003 | ||
LU | 27.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 14.05.2003 | |
FI | 14.05.2003 | ||
IE | 14.05.2003 | ||
NL | 14.05.2003 | ||
DK | 14.08.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
CY | 27.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 14.05.2003 | |
FI | 14.05.2003 | ||
IE | 14.05.2003 | ||
NL | 14.05.2003 | ||
DK | 14.08.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | AT | 14.05.2003 | |
FI | 14.05.2003 | ||
IE | 14.05.2003 | ||
NL | 14.05.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 14.05.2003 | |
FI | 14.05.2003 | ||
NL | 14.05.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 14.05.2003 | |
NL | 14.05.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | NL | 14.05.2003 | |
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 14.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2091884 (RAFFINAGE CIE FRANCAISE) [A] 1-14 * page 1, line 33 - page 2, line 9 *; | [A]US3742187 (FOLUS S) [A] 1-14* figure -; claim - *; | [AD]FR2618336 (SCHWARZMANN PAUL [FR]); | [AD]EP0727228 (BIO MERIEUX [FR]) [AD] 1-14 * figure -; claim - * |