blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0968514

EP0968514 - COLOR DISPLAY DEVICE WITH A DEFLECTION-DEPENDENT DISTANCE BETWEEN OUTER BEAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.01.2005
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.01.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.03.2005  [2005/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / VAN NES, Johannes, C., A.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / DEN ENGELSEN, Daniel
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
03 / SLUYTERMAN, Albertus, A., S.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Baele, Ingrid Albertina F.M., et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]Baele, Ingrid Albertina F.M., et al
Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2000/01]Koppen, Jan
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date98957093.214.12.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998IB02035
Priority number, dateEP1997020412829.12.1997         Original published format: EP 97204128
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9934392
Date:08.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968514
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968514
Date:24.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE08.07.1999
ClassificationIPC:H01J29/70
[2000/01]
CPC:
H01J29/705 (EP,US); H01J29/70 (KR); H01J29/707 (EP,US);
H01J2229/5687 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/01]
TitleGerman:FARBANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG MIT ABLENK-ABHÄNGIGEM ABSTAND ZWISCHEN DEN AUSSENSTRAHLEN[2003/23]
English:COLOR DISPLAY DEVICE WITH A DEFLECTION-DEPENDENT DISTANCE BETWEEN OUTER BEAMS[2000/01]
French:VISUEL A DISTANCE ENTRE FAISCEAUX EXTERIEURS DEPENDANTE DE LA DEVIATION[2000/01]
Former [2000/01]FARBANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG MIT ABLERK-ABHÄNGIGEM ABSTAND ZWISCHEN DER AUSSENSTRAHLEN
Entry into regional phase29.09.1999National basic fee paid 
29.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/10]
07.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.11.2003Fee for grant paid
24.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]US5248920  (GIOIA NORMAN F [US], et al);
 [Y]US4864195  (MASTERTON WALTER D [US]);
 [X]EP0421523  (PHILIPS NV [NL]);
 [A]EP0382299  (PHILIPS NV [NL])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.