EP0986914 - DATA TRANSFORMATION OF THE INVERSE FOURIER TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.02.2002 [2002/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISCH, Eberhard Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | den Braber, Gérard Paul Philips Corporate Intellectual Property 156 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | den Braber, Gerard Paul Philips Corporate Intellectual Property, 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98957097.3 | 14.12.1998 | [2000/12] | WO1998IB02039 | Priority number, date | US19970000667 | 30.12.1997 Original published format: US 667 | [2000/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9935851 | Date: | 15.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0986914 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 16.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/30 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
G06F17/147 (EP,US);
H04N19/60 (KR);
H04N5/92 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/12] | Title | German: | DATENTRANSFORMATION IN DER ART EINER INVERSENFOURIERTRANSFORMATION | [2000/12] | English: | DATA TRANSFORMATION OF THE INVERSE FOURIER TYPE | [2000/12] | French: | TRANSFORMATION DE DONNEES DE TYPE TRANSFORMEE INVERSE DE FOURIER | [2000/12] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 20.12.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]EP0854653 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]); | [X]US5576958 (KAWAKATSU YASUHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US5467131 (BHASKARAN VASUDEV [US], et al); | [A]EP0443114 (IBM [US]); | [A]US5371611 (KATO HISAHARU [JP], et al) |