08.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] |
21.11.2008 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
02.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
18.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] |
14.03.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] |
14.12.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] |
14.09.2007 |
Change - representative |
published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] |
05.01.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.02.2007 [2007/06] |
22.12.2006 |
Change - German title |
published on 24.01.2007 [2007/04] |
08.12.2006 |
Change - German title |
published on 10.01.2007 [2007/02] |
06.12.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.11.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.11.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.07.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.12.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.12.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.11.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.06.2004 |
First examination report |
|
16.06.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.12.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.12.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.11.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
15.05.2001 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.01.2001 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 07.03.2001 [2001/10] |
14.11.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.08.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.10.2000 [2000/40] |
18.08.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.10.2000 [2000/40] |
11.08.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.06.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.06.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.05.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.01.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|