EP1040736 - SYNTHETIC JET ACTUATORS FOR COOLING HEATED BODIES AND ENVIRONMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEORGIA TECH RESEARCH CORPORATION 400 10th Street, N.W., Centennial Research Building Atlanta, GA 30332-0415 / US | [2007/06] |
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states GEORGIA TECH RESEARCH CORPORATION 400 10th Street, N.W., Centennial Research Building Atlanta, GA 30332-0415 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLEZER, Ari 770 Kings Way, N.W. Atlanta, GA 30327 / US | 02 /
ALLEN, Mark, G. 425 Spalding Drive Atlanta, GA 30328 / US | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | Käck, Jürgen Patentanwälte Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | Käck, Jürgen Patentanwälte Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg / DE | ||
Former [2000/40] | Patentanwälte Rehberg + Hüppe Postfach 31 62 37021 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98957870.3 | 12.11.1998 | [2000/40] | WO1998US24137 | Priority number, date | US19970970607 | 14.11.1997 Original published format: US 970607 | [2000/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9926457 | Date: | 27.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1040736 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1040736 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.05.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/11, H05K1/14 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
F21V29/70 (EP,US);
B64C21/08 (EP,US);
B64G1/26 (EP,US);
B64G1/40 (US);
B64G1/401 (US);
F01D5/148 (EP,US);
F02K1/28 (EP,US);
F15C1/14 (EP,US);
F15C5/00 (EP,US);
F15D1/009 (EP,US);
F15D1/08 (EP,US);
F15D1/12 (EP,US);
F16K99/0001 (EP,US);
F16K99/0007 (EP,US);
F16K99/0048 (EP,US);
F21V29/677 (EP,US);
F21V29/74 (EP,US);
F21V29/83 (EP,US);
F23R3/24 (EP,US);
H01L23/4336 (EP,US);
H05K7/20172 (EP,US);
B64C2230/02 (EP,US);
B64C2230/04 (EP,US);
B64C2230/06 (EP,US);
B64C2230/14 (EP,US);
B64C2230/16 (EP,US);
B64C2230/18 (EP,US);
F16K2099/0094 (EP,US);
F16K2099/0098 (EP,US);
F16K99/0034 (EP,US);
F28F13/02 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3011 (EP,US);
Y02T50/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/40] | Title | German: | BETÄTIGUNGSELEMENTE FÜR EINEN KÜNSTLICHEN STRAHL ZUM KÜHLEN VON ERWÄRMTEN KÖRPERN UND UMGEBUNGEN | [2007/04] | English: | SYNTHETIC JET ACTUATORS FOR COOLING HEATED BODIES AND ENVIRONMENTS | [2000/40] | French: | ORGANES DE COMMANDE DE JETS SYNTHETIQUES PERMETTANT DE REFROIDIR DES CORPS ET DES ENVIRONNEMENTS CHAUFFES | [2000/40] |
Former [2000/40] | SNTHETISCHE BETÄTIGUNGSELEMENTE ZUR KÜHLUNG VON ERWÄRMTEN KÖRPERN UND UMGEBUNGEN | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2000 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 17.04.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.02.2007 | BE | 07.02.2007 | CH | 07.02.2007 | CY | 07.02.2007 | DK | 07.02.2007 | FI | 07.02.2007 | FR | 07.02.2007 | IT | 07.02.2007 | LI | 07.02.2007 | NL | 07.02.2007 | SE | 07.05.2007 | DE | 08.05.2007 | GR | 08.05.2007 | ES | 18.05.2007 | PT | 09.07.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/52] | AT | 07.02.2007 | |
BE | 07.02.2007 | ||
CH | 07.02.2007 | ||
DK | 07.02.2007 | ||
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
FR | 07.02.2007 | ||
IT | 07.02.2007 | ||
LI | 07.02.2007 | ||
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
DE | 08.05.2007 | ||
GR | 08.05.2007 | ||
ES | 18.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 07.02.2007 | |
BE | 07.02.2007 | ||
CH | 07.02.2007 | ||
DK | 07.02.2007 | ||
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
IT | 07.02.2007 | ||
LI | 07.02.2007 | ||
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
DE | 08.05.2007 | ||
GR | 08.05.2007 | ||
ES | 18.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
FR | 28.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 07.02.2007 | |
BE | 07.02.2007 | ||
CH | 07.02.2007 | ||
DK | 07.02.2007 | ||
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
LI | 07.02.2007 | ||
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
DE | 08.05.2007 | ||
GR | 08.05.2007 | ||
ES | 18.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/16] | AT | 07.02.2007 | |
BE | 07.02.2007 | ||
CH | 07.02.2007 | ||
DK | 07.02.2007 | ||
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
LI | 07.02.2007 | ||
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
DE | 08.05.2007 | ||
ES | 18.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4450505 (MITTAL FAQUIR C [US], et al); | International search | [Y]US4180377 (ITAKURA TSUYOSHI [JP]); | [X]US4261689 (TAKAHASHI SHIRO); | [X]US4495947 (MOTYCKA JIRI [CA]); | [Y]US5034688 (MOULENE DANIEL [FR], et al); | [Y]US5121290 (AZAR KAVEH [US]); | [Y]US5402312 (KINJO MORISHIGE [JP], et al); | [A]US5681152 (ANGSTROM HS WILGOT [SE]); | [XP]US5742954 (IDLAND CARSTEN H [US]) |