EP1032266 - USE OF DELTA5-ANDROSTENE-3BETA-OL-7,17-DIONE IN THE TREATMENT OF ARTHRITIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUMANETICS CORPORATION 18894 Lake Drive East Chanhassen, Minnesota 55317 / US | [2000/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEEKS, Charles, E. 5276 Lakeview Avenue White Bear Lake, MN 55110 / US | [2000/36] | Representative(s) | Van Malderen, Joëlle, et al pronovem - Office Van Malderen Avenue Josse Goffin 158 1082 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | Van Malderen, Joelle, et al Office Van Malderen, Place Reine Fabiola 6/1 1083 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 98958020.4 | 17.11.1998 | [2000/36] | WO1998US24458 | Priority number, date | US19970066197P | 19.11.1997 Original published format: US 66197 P | [2000/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9925192 | Date: | 27.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1032266 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.05.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01N45/00, A61K31/56 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
A61K31/565 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/36] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON DELTA-5-ANDROSTEN-3-BETA-OL-7,17-DION IN DER BEHANDLUNG DER ARTHRITIS | [2000/36] | English: | USE OF DELTA5-ANDROSTENE-3BETA-OL-7,17-DIONE IN THE TREATMENT OF ARTHRITIS | [2000/36] | French: | UTILISATION DE DELTA5-ANDROSTENE-3BETA-OL-7,17-DIONE DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE L'ARTHRITE | [2000/36] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2000 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/36] | 14.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/47] | 05.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4628052 (PEAT RAYMOND F) [X] 1 * column 2, line 15 - column 2, line 62; claims 1-11 * [Y] 1-5; | [Y]US5292730 (LARDY HENRY A) [Y] 1-5 * column 2, line 8 - column 3, line 66 *; | [A]JPH09151197 ; | [A]US3107256 (MARCEL HARNIK) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 15 *; | [A]US4812447 (ROBERTS EUGENE) [A] 1 * column 1, line 35 - column 1, line 40 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, & JP09151197 A 19970610 (L T T KENKYUSHO:KK) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | International search | [Y] - PEAT R F, "PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING DEHYDROEPIANDROSTERONE AND OTHER ANESTHETIC STEROIDS IN THE TREATMENT OF ARTHRITIS AND OTHER JOINT DISABILITIES", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19000101), XP002915672 | [Y] - LARDY H A, "TREATMENT OF IMMUNE SYSTEM WITH .DELTA. 5-ANDROSTENES", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19000101), XP002915673 |