EP1032469 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SEPARATION OF LIQUID AND SOLID PHASES FOR SOLID PHASE ORGANIC SYNTHESES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TREGA BIOSCIENCES, INC. 9880 Campus Point Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2000/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEBL, Michal 6161 Arnoldson Court San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2000/36] | Representative(s) | Horner, Martin Grenville, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Horner, Martin Grenville, et al Marks & Clerk Scotland 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | ||
Former [2000/36] | Horner, Martin Grenville, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE, Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 98958035.2 | 17.11.1998 | [2000/36] | WO1998US24519 | Priority number, date | US19970974090 | 19.11.1997 Original published format: US 974090 | [2000/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9925470 | Date: | 27.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1032469 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1032469 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/00, B04B1/00 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
C07K1/045 (EP,US);
B01J19/0046 (EP,US);
B04B5/0407 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00315 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00421 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00461 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0049 (EP,US);
B01J2219/005 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00585 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00596 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0072 (EP,US);
C40B60/14 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00504 (EP,US);
G01N35/028 (EP,US);
Y10T436/111666 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/36] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR TRENNUNG VON FLÜSSIGEN UND FESTEN PHASEN IN ORGANISCHEN FESTPHASENSYNTHESEN | [2000/36] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SEPARATION OF LIQUID AND SOLID PHASES FOR SOLID PHASE ORGANIC SYNTHESES | [2000/36] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE SEPARATION DES PHASES LIQUIDE ET SOLIDE POUR DES SYNTHESES ORGANIQUES EN PHASE SOLIDE | [2000/36] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/36] | 06.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.03.2003 | BE | 12.03.2003 | CH | 12.03.2003 | FI | 12.03.2003 | GR | 12.03.2003 | IT | 12.03.2003 | LI | 12.03.2003 | NL | 12.03.2003 | DK | 12.06.2003 | SE | 12.06.2003 | PT | 16.06.2003 | ES | 30.09.2003 | CY | 17.11.2003 | LU | 17.11.2003 | MC | 30.11.2003 | [2008/16] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
BE | 12.03.2003 | ||
CH | 12.03.2003 | ||
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
LI | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
DK | 12.06.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
CY | 17.11.2003 | ||
LU | 17.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
BE | 12.03.2003 | ||
CH | 12.03.2003 | ||
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
LI | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
DK | 12.06.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
CY | 17.11.2003 | ||
LU | 17.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
BE | 12.03.2003 | ||
CH | 12.03.2003 | ||
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
LI | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
DK | 12.06.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
CY | 17.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
BE | 12.03.2003 | ||
CH | 12.03.2003 | ||
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
LI | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
DK | 12.06.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
BE | 12.03.2003 | ||
CH | 12.03.2003 | ||
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
LI | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
CH | 12.03.2003 | ||
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
LI | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
CH | 12.03.2003 | ||
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
LI | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
CH | 12.03.2003 | ||
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
LI | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | CH | 12.03.2003 | |
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
LI | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | CH | 12.03.2003 | |
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
LI | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | CH | 12.03.2003 | |
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
LI | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/40] | CH | 12.03.2003 | |
LI | 12.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3586484 (ANDERSON NORMAN G) [A] 1,4,8 * column W *; | [A]FR2156519 (IMMUNO AG) [A] 1-4,7 * the whole document *; | [X]US4412973 (GUIGAN JEAN [FR]) [X] 1,4 * column A * * column 2, line 30 - line 48 * * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 13 * * figures 1,4; claim - *; | [A]WO9310455 (CIRRUS DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [A] 1,4-6,8 * abstract *; | [A]EP0569115 (GEN ATOMICS [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A] - MENOTTI RUVO ET AL., "Facile Manual Synthesis of Peptide Libraries", PROTEIN AND PEPTIDE LETTERS., SCHIPHOL NL, (1994), vol. 1, no. 3, pages 187 - 192, XP002098198 [A] 1,4,7 * abstract * |