EP1033936 - BODY FLUID SAMPLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics Operations, Inc. 9115 Hague Road Indianapolis, Indiana 46250 / US | [2005/15] |
Former [2000/37] | For all designated states Amira Medical 4742 Scotts Valley Drive Scotts Valley, CA 95066 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUCHON, Brent, G. 11352 Anegada Street Cypress, CA 90630 / US | 02 /
ROE, Jeffrey, N. 3212 Veracruz Drive San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | 03 /
RADWANSKI, Ryszard 16830 Sundance Drive Morgan Hill, CA 95037 / US | 04 /
DOUGLAS, Joel, S. 2048 Calabazas Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | [2000/44] |
Former [2000/37] | 01 /
DUCHON, Brent, G. 410 Milan Drive 106 San Jose, CA 95134 / US | ||
02 /
ROE, Jeffrey, N. 3212 Veracruz Drive San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | |||
03 /
RADWANSKI, Ryszard 16830 Sundance Drive Morgan Hill, CA 95037 / US | |||
04 /
DOUGLAS, Joel, S. 2048 Calabazas Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/37] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98958459.4 | 18.11.1998 | [2000/37] | WO1998US23256 | Priority number, date | US19970975978 | 21.11.1997 Original published format: US 975978 | [2000/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9926539 | Date: | 03.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1033936 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1033936 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/151 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
A61B5/15194 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150099 (EP,US);
A61B5/150412 (EP,US);
A61B5/150503 (EP,US);
A61B5/150549 (EP,US);
A61B5/150618 (EP,US);
A61B5/150717 (EP,US);
A61B5/15111 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/37] | A61B5/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IE, IT [2000/37] | Title | German: | KÖRPERFLÜSSIGKEITSENTNAHMEVORRICHTUNG | [2000/37] | English: | BODY FLUID SAMPLING DEVICE | [2000/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF SERVANT A PRELEVER UN SPECIMEN DE LIQUIDE CORPOREL | [2000/37] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/37] | 08.08.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06004236.3 / EP1671586 | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 24.08.2006 | IE | 20.11.2006 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/18] | DK | 24.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0671146 (ADVANCE KK [JP]) [A] * column 3, line 15 - column 5, line 33; table 1 *; | [A]EP0688532 (NISSHO KK [JP]) [A] * column 3, line 17 - line 51 ** page 4, line 23 - page 6, line 3; table 1 *; | [A]WO9742885 (MERCURY DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * page 10, line 10 - line 16 * * page 11, line 29 - page 12, line 14 * * page 13, line 34 - page 14, line 5 * * page 15, line 1 - line 17; tables 1-3,8,9 *; | [PXA]WO9743962 (MERCURY DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [PX] 1,2 * page 10, line 3 - page 13, line 16; tables 1-6 * [A] 3,5,17,19 |