EP1027549 - INTERCHANGEABLE VALVE ACTUATOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ERIE MANUFACTURING COMPANY 4000 South 13th Street Milwaukee Wisconsin 53221 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states ERIE MANUFACTURING COMPANY 4000 South 13th Street Milwaukee, Wisconsin 53221 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHREINER, Michael, R. 1754 West Second Avenue Port Washington, WI 53074 / US | 02 /
SCHLAIS, John, H. 2887 South 128th Street New Berlin, WI 53151 / US | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | Brunner, Michael John GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98958480.0 | 06.11.1998 | [2000/33] | WO1998US23676 | Priority number, date | US19970966379 | 07.11.1997 Original published format: US 966379 | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9924745 | Date: | 20.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1027549 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1027549 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/04 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
F16K31/043 (EP,US);
F16K31/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/33] | Title | German: | AUSTAUSCHBARES VENTILBETÄTIGUNGSSYSTEM | [2000/33] | English: | INTERCHANGEABLE VALVE ACTUATOR SYSTEM | [2000/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUSSOIR INTERCHANGEABLE | [2000/33] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 04.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.01.2004 | BE | 14.01.2004 | CH | 14.01.2004 | CY | 14.01.2004 | FI | 14.01.2004 | LI | 14.01.2004 | DK | 14.04.2004 | GR | 14.04.2004 | SE | 14.04.2004 | ES | 25.04.2004 | PT | 14.06.2004 | [2015/21] |
Former [2008/16] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
BE | 14.01.2004 | ||
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
CY | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
PT | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2007/18] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
BE | 14.01.2004 | ||
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
CY | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
BE | 14.01.2004 | ||
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
BE | 14.01.2004 | ||
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
SE | 14.04.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8300368 (PHILADELPHIA GEAR CORP [US]) [A] 1-51* abstract *; | [A]DE8407586U (BASF) [A] 1-51 * figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *; | [A]DE9010608U (MEIER) [A] 1-51 * page 8, line 6 - line 27; figures 1,2 * |