Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100482158B | Global Dossier | 13.04.2005 | B1 | KR20010024582 | 26.03.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US9823676 | 06.11.1998 | US96637997 | 07.11.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1027549 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2004 | B1 | EP1027549 | 16.08.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9823676 | 06.11.1998 | US96637997 | 07.11.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE257922T | 15.01.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US9823676 | 06.11.1998 | US96637997 | 07.11.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2309447 | 01.06.2004 | C | CA2309447 | 20.05.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9823676 | 06.11.1998 | US96637997 | 07.11.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69821133T | 18.11.2004 | T2 | DE69821133D1 | 19.02.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9823676 | 06.11.1998 | US96637997 | 07.11.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9924745 | Global Dossier | 20.05.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96637997 | 07.11.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1097189C | 25.12.2002 | C | CN1281541 | 24.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US96637997 | 07.11.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6073907 | 13.06.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US96637997 | 07.11.1997 |