EP1041933 - SYSTEMS FOR ELECTROSURGICAL TREATMENT OF THE SKIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/41] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ELECTROSURGICAL TREATMENT OF THE SKIN | ||
[2003/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARTHROCARE CORPORATION 680 Vaqueros Avenue Sunnyvale California 940865-3523 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | For all designated states ArthroCare Corporation 680 Vaqueros Avenue Sunnyvale, California 940865-3523 / US | ||
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states ARTHROCARE CORPORATION 595 North Pastoria Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLSEN, Phillip, M. 575 Sullivan Drive Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | 02 /
BRUNELL, Stephen, M. 1915 Mt. Vernon Court 5 Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 03 /
THAPLIYAL, Hira, V. 1192 Volti Lane Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | 04 /
EGGERS, Andrew, R. 5330 U.S. Route 42 Ostrander, OH 43061 / US | 05 /
EGGERS, Philip, E. 5366 Reserve Drive Dublin, OH 43017 / US | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire, 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98958641.7 | 18.11.1998 | [2000/41] | WO1998US24654 | Priority number, date | US19970977845 | 25.11.1997 Original published format: US 977845 | US19970978340 | 25.11.1997 Original published format: US 978340 | US19980162117 | 28.09.1998 Original published format: US 162117 | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9926546 | Date: | 03.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1041933 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1041933 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.06.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/20, A61B18/12 | [2003/17] | CPC: |
A61B18/1402 (EP);
A61B18/042 (EP);
A61B2018/00029 (EP);
A61B2018/00148 (EP);
A61B2018/00404 (EP);
A61B2018/0047 (EP);
A61B2018/00476 (EP);
A61B2018/00583 (EP);
A61B2018/00601 (EP);
A61B2018/00625 (EP);
A61B2018/00797 (EP);
A61B2018/00815 (EP);
A61B2018/00821 (EP);
A61B2018/1213 (EP);
A61B2018/1472 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2000/52] | A61B17/20, A61B17/39 | ||
Former IPC [2000/41] | A61B17/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/41] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ELEKTROCHIRURGISCHEN HAUTBEHANDLUNG | [2003/17] | English: | SYSTEMS FOR ELECTROSURGICAL TREATMENT OF THE SKIN | [2003/17] | French: | SYSTEMES POUR LE TRAITEMENT ELECTROCHIRURGICAL DE LA PEAU | [2003/17] |
Former [2000/41] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ELEKTROCHIRURGISCHEN HAUTBEHANDLUNG | ||
Former [2000/41] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ELECTROSURGICAL TREATMENT OF THE SKIN | ||
Former [2000/41] | SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES POUR LE TRAITEMENT ELECTROCHIRURGICAL DE LA PEAU | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.1999 | Search fee paid | 05.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 22.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 22.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 01.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 14.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 03.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12] | Request for further processing for: | 03.11.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 03.11.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.11.2003 | Decision despatched | 14.01.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 14.01.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.01.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.03.2004 | BE | 31.03.2004 | CH | 31.03.2004 | CY | 31.03.2004 | FI | 31.03.2004 | FR | 31.03.2004 | IT | 31.03.2004 | LI | 31.03.2004 | NL | 31.03.2004 | DK | 30.06.2004 | GR | 30.06.2004 | SE | 30.06.2004 | ES | 12.07.2004 | PT | 31.08.2004 | IE | 18.11.2004 | LU | 18.11.2004 | MC | 30.11.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/18] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
CY | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
FR | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
NL | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
IE | 18.11.2004 | ||
LU | 18.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
FR | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
NL | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
IE | 18.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
FR | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
NL | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
NL | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/48] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
SE | 30.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9634568 (KNOWLTON EDWARD W [US]); | [A]WO9715238 (ORATEC INTERVENTIONS INC [US]) | International search | [Y]US5098431 (RYDELL MARK A [US]); | [Y]US5122138 (MANWARING KIM H [US]) | by applicant | WO9426228 | US5683366 | US5697281 |