EP1036114 - COMPOSITIONS BASED ON SEMICRYSTALLINE THERMOPLASTIC RESINS AND BLOCK COPOLYMERS, RESULTING MATERIALS AND METHODS FOR OBTAINING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKEMA FRANCE 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2007/42] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states Arkema France 4-8, cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states ARKEMA 4-8 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [2000/38] | For all designated states Atofina 4/8 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COURT, François Village de l'Eglise F-27470 Fontaine l'Abbé / FR | 02 /
LEIBLER, Ludwik 29, avenue de Lamballe F-75016 Paris / FR | 03 /
MOURRAN, Ahmed Ochsensteige 85 D-89075 Ulm / DE | 04 /
NAVARRO, Christophe Le Baroun 12 F-64520 Bidache / FR | 05 /
ROYACKKERS, Vincent 9, rue Mathilde F-27300 Bernay / FR | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | Lhoste, Catherine, et al ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Lhoste, Catherine, et al ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/42] | Lhoste, Catherine, et al ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2000/38] | Rieux, Michel, et al ATOFINA, Département Propriété Industrielle, 4/8, Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 98958958.5 | 07.12.1998 | [2000/38] | WO1998FR02635 | Priority number, date | FR19970015389 | 05.12.1997 Original published format: FR 9715389 | [2000/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9929772 | Date: | 17.06.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1036114 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08L101/00, C08L25/06, C08L27/00, C08L67/02, C08L69/00, C08L71/02, C08L77/00, C08L53/02, // (C08L101/00, 53:02),(C08L25/06, 53:02),(C08L27/00, 53:02),(C08L67/02, 53:02),(C08L69/00, 53:02),(C08L71/02, 53:02),(C08L77/00, 53:02) | [2000/38] | CPC: |
C08L27/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08L53/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08F297/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08J5/00 (KR);
C08L27/24 (EP,KR,US);
C08L69/00 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08L27/06, C08L2666/24 (EP,US);
C08L27/24, C08L2666/24 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/38] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUS HALBKRISTALLINEN, THERMOPLASTISCHEN HARZEN UND BLOCKCOPOLYMEREN, DAMIT ERHALTENE GEGENSTÄNDE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2000/38] | English: | COMPOSITIONS BASED ON SEMICRYSTALLINE THERMOPLASTIC RESINS AND BLOCK COPOLYMERS, RESULTING MATERIALS AND METHODS FOR OBTAINING SAME | [2000/38] | French: | COMPOSITIONS A BASE DE RESINES THERMOPLASTIQUES SEMI-CRISTALLINES ET DE COPOLYMERES A BLOCS, LES MATERIAUX OBTENUS ET LEURS PROCEDES D'OBTENTION | [2000/38] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 07.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/09] | 07.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]EP0832929 (KURARAY CO [JP]) [PX] 1-12,15,18-20,23-28 * page 7, line 55 - page 8, line 3; example 18; claim - *; | [X]US4255534 (LIU PING Y) [X] 1-11,25-28 * example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0086448 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-11,23,25-28 * example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0430214 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK [JP]) [X] 1-11,23,25-28 * examples 10-22,24-28; claim - *; | JPH07278364 [ ] (DAICEL CHEM); | [A]US5484838 (HELMS JEFFREY H [US], et al) [A] 1,26 * column 2, line 27 - line 49; claim - * | [X] - G. RIESS ET AL., "New morphologies in rubber-modified polymers", JOURNAL OF MACROMOLECULAR SCIENCE PART B PHYSICS, (1980), vol. B17, no. 2, pages 355 - 374, XP002096651 [X] 1-11,23,25-28 * page 361 * | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19960304), vol. 124, no. 10, Database accession no. 119152, XP002107042 [X] 1-11,25-28 * abstract * |