EP1036327 - HLA-E binding to CD94/NKG2+ cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/38] | HLA-E BINDING | ||
[2009/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISIS INNOVATION LIMITED Ewert House, Ewert Place Summertown Oxford OX2 7SG / GB | [2007/44] |
Former [2000/38] | For all designated states ISIS INNOVATIONS LIMITED 2 South Parks Road Oxford, Oxfordshire OX1 3UB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAUD, Veronique, M., Inst. Molecular Medicine John Radcliffe Hospital Oxford Oxfordshire OX3 9DS / GB | 02 /
ALLAN, David, S., J., Inst. Molecular Medicine John Radcliffe Hospital Oxford, Oxfordshire OX3 9DS / GB | 03 /
OGG, Graham, S., Institute of Molecular Medicine John Radcliffe Hospital Oxford, Oxfordshire OX3 9DS / GB | 04 /
O'CALLAGHAN, Christopher, A., Inst. Molecular Med. John Radcliffe Hospital Oxford, Oxfordshire OX3 9DS / GB | 05 /
McMICHAEL, Andrew, J., Inst. Molecular Medicineedi John Radcliffe Hospital Oxford, Oxfordshire Ore OX3 9DS / GB | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | Campbell, Joanne Marie Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | Heaton, Joanne Marie Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98959027.8 | 04.12.1998 | [2000/38] | WO1998GB03686 | Priority number, date | GB19970025764 | 04.12.1997 Original published format: GB 9725764 | [2000/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9928748 | Date: | 10.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1036327 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1036327 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
G01N33/56977 (EP,US);
C07K16/2896 (US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
C07K16/2851 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/38] | Title | German: | HLA-E Bindung zu CD94/NKG2+ Zellen | [2009/04] | English: | HLA-E binding to CD94/NKG2+ cells | [2009/04] | French: | Liaison de HLA-E aux cellules CD94/NKG2+ | [2009/04] |
Former [2000/38] | HLA-E BINDUNG | ||
Former [2000/38] | HLA-E BINDING | ||
Former [2000/38] | LIAISON HLA-E | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 08.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09165917.7 / EP2144065 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.07.2009 | BE | 29.07.2009 | CY | 29.07.2009 | DK | 29.07.2009 | FI | 29.07.2009 | IT | 29.07.2009 | NL | 29.07.2009 | SE | 29.07.2009 | GR | 30.10.2009 | ES | 09.11.2009 | PT | 29.11.2009 | IE | 04.12.2009 | LU | 04.12.2009 | CH | 31.12.2009 | LI | 31.12.2009 | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/25] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
BE | 29.07.2009 | ||
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IT | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
IE | 04.12.2009 | ||
LU | 04.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
BE | 29.07.2009 | ||
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH03112487 ; | [X]JPH03112486 ; | [X]JPH03112485 ; | [PX] - BORREGO, FRANCISCO ET AL, "Recognition of human histocompatibility leukocyte antigen (HLA)-E complexed with HLA class I signal sequence-derived peptides by CD94 /NKG2 confers protection from natural killer cell-mediated lysis.", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (MARCH 2, 1998) VOL. 187, NO. 5, PP. 813-818., XP002109019 [PX] 1-8,14-17,20-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.187.5.813 | [PX] - BRAUD, VERONIQUE M. (1) ET AL, "HLA - E binds to natural killer cell receptors CD94 /NKG2A, B and C.", NATURE (LONDON), (FEB. 19, 1998) VOL. 391, NO. 6669, PP. 795-799., XP002109020 [PX] 1-8,14-17,20-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35869 | [PX] - O'CALLAGHAN ET AL, "Structural features impose tight peptide binding specificity in the classical MNC molecule HLA-E", MOLECULAR CELL, (199803), vol. 1, no. 4, page 531-541, XP002109609 [PX] 1-8,14-17,20-23 * page 538, column R, paragraph 3 - page 539, column L, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1097-2765(00)80053-2 | [PX] - LEIBSON P. J, "Cytotoxic lymphocyte recognition of HLA-E: Utilizing a nonclasical window to peer into classical MHC", IMMUNITY, (199809), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 289 - 294, XP002109610 [PX] 1-8,14-17,20-23 * page 291, column L, paragraph 3 - page 292, column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1074-7613(00)80611-1 | [PX] - POSCH ET AL, "HLA-E is the ligand for the natural killer cell CD94/NKG2 receptors", J.BIOMED.SCI, (199809), vol. 5, no. 5, pages 321 - 331, XP002109611 [PX] 1-8,14-17,20-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000025346 | [PX] - LEE ET AL, "HLA-E bound peptides influence recognition by inhibitory and triggering CD94/NKG2 receptors", EUR.J.IMMUN., (199809), vol. 28, no. 9, pages 2854 - 2863, XP002109612 [PX] 1-8,14-17,20-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-4141(199812)28:12<4188::AID-IMMU4188>3.0.CO;2-B | [PX] - O'CALLAGHAN ET AL, "Structure & function of the human MNC class 1b molecules HLA-A, -E, -F and HLA-G", IMMUNOL.REV., (1998), vol. 163, pages 129 - 138, XP002109613 [PX] 1-8,14-17,20-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-065X.1998.tb01192.x | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910802), vol. 015, no. 302, Database accession no. (C - 0855), & JP03112487 A 19910514 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO LTD) [X] 9-13,18,19 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910802), vol. 015, no. 302, Database accession no. (C - 0855), & JP03112486 A 19910514 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO LTD) [X] 9-13,18,19 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910802), vol. 015, no. 302, Database accession no. (C - 0855), & JP03112485 A 19910514 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO LTD) [X] 9-13,18,19 * abstract * | Examination | - SÖDERSTRÖM K. ET AL, "CD94/NKG2 is the predominant inhibitory receptor involved in recognition of HLA-G by decidual and peripheral blood NK cells.", J. IMMUNOL., (19970801), vol. 159, pages 1072 - 1075 | - ULBRECHT M. ET AL, "Impaired intracellular transport and cell surface expression of nonpolymorphic HLA-E: Evidence for inefficient peptide binding.", J. EXP. MED., (199210), vol. 176, pages 1083 - 1090 | - LE BOUTEILLER P. ET AL, "Antigen-presenting function(s) of the non-classical HLA-E, -F and -G class I molecules: the beginning of a story.", RES. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 147, no. 5, pages 301 - 313 |