EP1037705 - CRYSTAL-CONTAINING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De Beers Industrial Diamonds (Proprietary) Limited Seo Building, Corner Crownwood & Booysens Reserve Roads, Theta 2001 Johannesburg / ZA | [N/P] |
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states DE BEERS INDUSTRIAL DIAMONDS (PROPRIETARY) LIMITED Seo Building, Corner Crownwood & Booysens Reserve Roads, Theta 2001 Johannesburg / ZA | ||
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states DE BEERS INDUSTRIAL DIAMOND DIVISION (PTY) LIMITED Debid House, Corner Amethyst Street and Crownwood Road, Theta Johannesburg 2001, Transvaal / ZA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIES, Geoffrey, John 36 Boundary Road Linden Extension Randburg 2194 / ZA | 02 /
CHAPMAN, Raymond, Albert 183 Columbine Avenue Mondeor Johannesburg 2091 / ZA | 03 /
STEWART, Aulette 22 Nicolyn Avenue Ruiterhof Randburg 2194 / ZA | 04 /
HEDGES, Lesley, Kay 4 Oriole Mews Delphinium Street Brackenhurst 1448 / ZA | 05 /
ADIA, Moosa, Mahomed 8 Nagel Street Lakefield Benoni 1501 / ZA | [2000/39] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2003/17] | Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2000/39] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98959034.4 | 10.12.1998 | [2000/39] | WO1998GB03696 | Priority number, date | ZA19970011150 | 11.12.1997 Original published format: ZA 9711150 | [2000/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9929412 | Date: | 17.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1037705 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1037705 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01J3/06 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
B01J3/062 (EP,US);
B01J8/06 (KR);
B01J2203/062 (EP,US);
B01J2203/0655 (EP,US);
B01J2203/0685 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/39] | Title | German: | KRISTALL-ENTHALTENDES MATERIAL | [2000/39] | English: | CRYSTAL-CONTAINING MATERIAL | [2000/39] | French: | MATIERE CONTENANT DES CRISTAUX | [2000/39] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 31.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/27] | Request for further processing for: | 18.06.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 05.06.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.06.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.07.2002 | BE | 10.07.2002 | NL | 10.07.2002 | SE | 10.10.2002 | GB | 10.12.2002 | [2004/22] |
Former [2003/48] | AT | 10.07.2002 | |
BE | 10.07.2002 | ||
NL | 10.07.2002 | ||
SE | 10.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 10.07.2002 | |
NL | 10.07.2002 | ||
SE | 10.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 10.07.2002 | |
SE | 10.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/03] | SE | 10.10.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0079117 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 4, line 12 - line 25 * * page 4, line 37 - page 5, line 2 * * claim - *; | [A]US4551316 (IIZUKA EIICHI [JP]) [A] 1-16,4,5,7-9 * column A * * column 2, line 49 - line 54 * * column 4, line 23 - line 48 * * column 11, line 24 - line 38 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5151107 (CHO HYUN S [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * figures 1-3; claims 23-43 * * column A *; | [A] - HONGCHANG YU ET AL., "Sintering of Ultrafine Diamond Particles Under High Temperature and High Pressure", DIAMOND AND RELATED MATERIALS, LAUSANNE CH, (19940201), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 222 - 226, XP000483447 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0925-9635(94)90083-3 | [A] - SHI MING HONG ET AL., "Diamond Formation from a System of SiC and a Metal", DIAMOND AND RELATED MATERIALS., AMSTERDAM NL, (1993), vol. 2, pages 508 - 511, XP000361192 [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 508, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 510, column R, paragraph 2 * * figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0925-9635(93)90110-N | [A] - JAE-KAP LEE ET AL., "Effect of the Buoyancy Force on Diamond Formation During Synthesis Under a High Pressure", DIAMOND AND RELATED MATERIALS, AMSTERDAM NL, (19930331), vol. 2, pages 496 - 499, XP000361191 [A] 1-16 * page 497, column L, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * figures 3,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0925-9635(93)90107-D | [A] - A.V. ANDREYEV & H. KANDA, "Diamond Formation and Wettability in a Mg-Cu-C System Under High Pressure and High Temperature", DIAMOND AND RELATED MATERIALS, AMSTERDAM NL, (199701), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 28 - 32, XP004061142 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-9635(96)00576-6 |