blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0969940

EP0969940 - APPARATUS FOR LUBRICATING EDGE DAM IN TWIN-ROLL TYPE STRIP CASTING MACHINE, AND METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.06.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.08.2004  [2004/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
POHANG IRON & STEEL CO., LTD.
1, Koedong-dong, Nam-ku Pohang-si
Kyungsangbook-do 790-300 / KR
For all designated states
RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF INDUSTRIAL SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY
San 32 Hyoja-dong, Nam-ku Pohang-si
Kyungsangbook-do 790-330 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2003/34]For all designated states
POHANG IRON & STEEL CO., LTD.
1, Koedong-dong, Nam-ku
Pohang-si, Kyungsangbook-do 790-300 / KR
For all designated states
RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF INDUSTRIAL SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY
San 32 Hyoja-dong, Nam-ku
Pohang-si, Kyungsangbook-do 790-330 / KR
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
POHANG IRON & STEEL CO., LTD.
1, Koedong-dong, Nam-ku
Pohang City, Kyongsangbook-do 790-300 / KR
For all designated states
RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF INDUSTRIAL SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY
San 32 Hyoja-dong, Nam-ku
Pohang City, Kyong Sang Book-Do 790-330 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / CHEONG, Han, Nam, Research Institute of Industrial
Science & Technology San 32, Hyoja-dong Nam-ku
Pohang-si Kyungsangbook-do 790-330 / KR
02 / CHOO, Dong, Kyun, Research Institute of Industrial
Science & Technology San 32, Hyoja-dong Nam-ku
Pohang-si Kyungsangbook-do 790-330 / KR
03 / KANG, Tae, Wook, Research Institute of Industrial
Science & Technology, San 32, Hyoja-dong Nam-ku
Pohang-si Kyungsangbook-do 790-330 / KR
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date98959281.116.12.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998KR00432
Priority number, dateKR1997007122920.12.1997         Original published format: KR 9771229
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9932246
Date:01.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969940
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969940
Date:20.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AT01.07.1999
ClassificationIPC:B22D11/06
[2000/02]
CPC:
B22D11/0668 (EP,US); B22D11/06 (KR)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/02]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM SCHMIEREN EINES SEITENDAMMES IN EINER DOPPELROLLENGIESSANLAGE[2000/02]
English:APPARATUS FOR LUBRICATING EDGE DAM IN TWIN-ROLL TYPE STRIP CASTING MACHINE, AND METHOD THEREFOR[2000/02]
French:APPAREIL DESTINE A LUBRIFIER UNE DIGUE A BORDS DANS UNE MACHINE DE COULEE DE BANDE DE TYPE A DEUX CYLINDRES ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase09.08.1999National basic fee paid 
09.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
09.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
13.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.06.2003Fee for grant paid
13.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
11.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0677345  (USINOR SACILOR [FR], et al);
 [A]JPH09248658  ;
 [A]JPH0615416
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 98, No. 1, 30 January 1998; & JP 09248658 A (NIPPON STEEL CORP) 22 September 1997., & JP09248658 A 19970922
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 18, No. 217, 19 April 1994; & JP 6015416 A (NIPPON STEEL CORP)., & JP6015416 A 19940419
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.