EP1031247 - FLEXIBLE FREQUENCY-TIME DIVISION DUPLEX IN RADIO COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2004 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ericsson Inc. 6300 Legacy Drive MS EVW 2-C-2 Plano, TX 75024 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/02] | For all designated states Ericsson Inc. 6300 Legacy, MS EVW 2-C-2 Plano, TX 75024 / US | ||
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states Ericsson Inc. 7001 Development Drive Research Triangle Park, N.C. 27709 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LENZO, Michael 314 Widdington Lane Apex, NC 27502 / US | 02 /
SHEN, Qun 10978 West Ocean Drive 3119, San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2000/42] |
Former [2000/35] | 01 /
LENZO, Michael 314 Widdington Lane Apex, NC 27502 / US | ||
02 /
SHEN, Qun 110 Connors Circle Cary, NC 27502 / US | Representative(s) | Sjöberg, Mats Hakan, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit Kista RAN Implementation & Core (PU-KRIC) Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/02] | Sjöberg, Mats Hakan, et al Ericsson AB, Patent Unit Radio Networks 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2001/16] | Wennerholm, Kristian, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB, Patent Unit Radio Access 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2000/35] | Wennerholm, Kristian, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB Common Patent Department 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 98959453.6 | 13.11.1998 | [2000/35] | WO1998US24370 | Priority number, date | US19970065797P | 14.11.1997 Original published format: US 65797 P | US19980189808 | 12.11.1998 Original published format: US 189808 | [2000/43] |
Former [2000/35] | US19970065797P | 14.11.1997 | |
US98 | 12.11.1998 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9926437 | Date: | 27.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1031247 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1031247 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/30 | [2000/35] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/35] | Title | German: | FLEXIBLES FREQUENZ-ZEITDUPLEX IN FUNKÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEMEN | [2002/43] | English: | FLEXIBLE FREQUENCY-TIME DIVISION DUPLEX IN RADIO COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS | [2000/35] | French: | DUPLEX SOUPLE A REPARTITION EN FREQUENCE ET DANS LE TEMPS DANS DES SYSTEMES DE RADIOCOMMUNICATIONS | [2000/35] |
Former [2000/35] | FLEXIBELE FREQUENZ-ZEITDUPLEX IN FUNKÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEMEN | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/35] | 25.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.04.2003 | BE | 02.04.2003 | CH | 02.04.2003 | FI | 02.04.2003 | FR | 02.04.2003 | IT | 02.04.2003 | LI | 02.04.2003 | NL | 02.04.2003 | DK | 02.07.2003 | GR | 02.07.2003 | PT | 02.07.2003 | SE | 02.07.2003 | ES | 30.10.2003 | CY | 13.11.2003 | IE | 13.11.2003 | LU | 13.11.2003 | MC | 30.11.2003 | [2008/16] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
BE | 02.04.2003 | ||
CH | 02.04.2003 | ||
FI | 02.04.2003 | ||
FR | 02.04.2003 | ||
LI | 02.04.2003 | ||
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
DK | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
CY | 13.11.2003 | ||
IE | 13.11.2003 | ||
LU | 13.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2005/03] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
BE | 02.04.2003 | ||
CH | 02.04.2003 | ||
FI | 02.04.2003 | ||
LI | 02.04.2003 | ||
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
DK | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
CY | 13.11.2003 | ||
IE | 13.11.2003 | ||
LU | 13.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
BE | 02.04.2003 | ||
CH | 02.04.2003 | ||
FI | 02.04.2003 | ||
LI | 02.04.2003 | ||
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
DK | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
CY | 13.11.2003 | ||
LU | 13.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
BE | 02.04.2003 | ||
CH | 02.04.2003 | ||
FI | 02.04.2003 | ||
LI | 02.04.2003 | ||
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
DK | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
CY | 13.11.2003 | ||
LU | 13.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
BE | 02.04.2003 | ||
CH | 02.04.2003 | ||
FI | 02.04.2003 | ||
LI | 02.04.2003 | ||
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
DK | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
CY | 13.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
BE | 02.04.2003 | ||
CH | 02.04.2003 | ||
FI | 02.04.2003 | ||
LI | 02.04.2003 | ||
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
DK | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
CH | 02.04.2003 | ||
FI | 02.04.2003 | ||
LI | 02.04.2003 | ||
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
DK | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
CH | 02.04.2003 | ||
FI | 02.04.2003 | ||
LI | 02.04.2003 | ||
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
CH | 02.04.2003 | ||
LI | 02.04.2003 | ||
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
CH | 02.04.2003 | ||
LI | 02.04.2003 | ||
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 02.04.2003 | |
LI | 02.04.2003 | ||
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | SE | 02.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [PX]US5689502 (SCOTT) [PX] 1 * column 8, line 59 - column 9, line 10; figures 4,5A *; | [A]US5617412 (DELPRAT ET AL.) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 6, line 4 - line 13 *; | [A]US5475677 (ARNOLD ET AL.) [A] 1,7,14,16 * abstract * * column 12, line 15 - line 51 *; | [A]US5602836 (PAPADOPOULOS ET AL.) [A] 1,9 * column 5, line 1 - line 26; figures 4,5 *; | [A]US5444696 (PETRANOVICH) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 38 - line 57 * * column 5, line 25 - line 50 * |