EP1044454 - COLLIMATOR FOR X-RAY PROXIMITY LITHOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Focused X-Rays LLC 4323 North 30th Street Boulder, CO 80301-1643 / US | [2000/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASH, Webster, C., Jr. 4323 North 30th Street Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [2000/42] | Representative(s) | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/42] | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al MATHISEN, MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98959537.6 | 20.11.1998 | [2000/42] | WO1998US24841 | Priority number, date | US19970066510P | 24.11.1997 Original published format: US 66510 P | [2000/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9927542 | Date: | 03.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1044454 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G21K1/06 | [2000/42] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
G03F7/70166 (EP,US);
G03F7/7035 (EP,US);
G21K1/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2000/42] | Title | German: | KOLLIMATOR FÜR RÖNTGENSTRAHLUNGEN-NÄHE-LITHOGRAPHIE | [2000/42] | English: | COLLIMATOR FOR X-RAY PROXIMITY LITHOGRAPHY | [2000/42] | French: | COLLIMATEUR POUR LITHOGRAPHIE DE PROXIMITE AUX RAYONS X | [2000/42] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2000 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/42] | 18.05.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5339346 (WHITE DONALD L [US]); | [A]US5604782 (CASH JR WEBSTER C [US]) |