EP0995162 - INTEGRATED BILL CONSOLIDATION, PAYMENT AGGREGATION, AND SETTLEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Watson, Craig M. 834 West George Chicago, IL 60657 / US | [2000/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/17] | Representative(s) | Charig, Raymond Julian, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | Charig, Raymond Julian, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98959559.0 | 20.11.1998 | [2000/17] | WO1998US24945 | Priority number, date | US19970976204 | 21.11.1997 Original published format: US 976204 | [2000/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9927479 | Date: | 03.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0995162 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2000/17] | CPC: |
G06Q30/04 (EP,US);
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q20/102 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40 (EP,US);
G06Q40/02 (EP,US);
G06Q40/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/17] | Title | German: | INTERGRIERTES SYSTEM ZUR RECHNUNGSZUSAMMENSTELLUNG, ZAHLUNGSAGGREGATION UND BEGLEICHUNG | [2000/23] | English: | INTEGRATED BILL CONSOLIDATION, PAYMENT AGGREGATION, AND SETTLEMENT SYSTEM | [2000/17] | French: | SYSTEME INTEGRE DE CONSOLIDATION DES FACTURES, DE REGROUPEMENT DES PAIEMENTS ET DE REGLEMENT | [2000/17] |
Former [2000/17] | INTERGRIERTE RECHNUNGSKONSOLIDIERUNG, SAMMELZAHLUNG UND BEGLEICHUNGSVERFAHREN | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2000 | Search fee paid | 03.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 02.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/01] | 13.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.01.2000 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   03.02.2000 | 11.01.2000 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   03.02.2000 | 11.01.2000 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   03.02.2000 | 11.01.2000 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   03.02.2000 | 11.01.2000 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   03.02.2000 | 11.01.2000 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   03.02.2000 | 11.01.2000 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   03.02.2000 | 11.01.2000 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   03.02.2000 | 11.01.2000 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   03.02.2000 | 11.01.2000 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   03.02.2000 | 11.01.2000 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   03.02.2000 | 11.01.2000 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   03.02.2000 | 11.01.2000 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   03.02.2000 | 11.01.2000 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   03.02.2000 | 11.01.2000 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   03.02.2000 | 11.01.2000 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   03.02.2000 | 11.01.2000 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   03.02.2000 | 11.01.2000 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   03.02.2000 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 |   Fee paid on   03.02.2000 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]US5832460 (BEDNAR GREGORY M [US], et al) |