EP1036317 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTINUOUSLY MONITORING AN AQUEOUS FLOW TO DETECT AND QUANTIFY IONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2006 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2006 [2006/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merril, John H. 3 Adams Street South Portland, ME 04106 / US | [2000/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | Nätebusch, Roderich Ottostrasse 24a 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [2000/38] | Application number, filing date | 98959643.2 | 01.12.1998 | [2000/38] | WO1998US25442 | Priority number, date | US19970984256 | 02.12.1997 Original published format: US 984256 | [2000/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9928737 | Date: | 10.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1036317 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.06.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/08, G01N33/18 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
G01N33/1813 (EP,US);
G01N27/10 (EP,US);
G01N33/1886 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/38] | G01N27/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/38] | Extension states | AL | 31.05.2000 | LT | 31.05.2000 | LV | 31.05.2000 | MK | 31.05.2000 | RO | 31.05.2000 | SI | 31.05.2000 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNUNTERBROCHENEN ÜBERWACHUNG EINER WÄSSERIGEN STRÖMUNG UM IONEN FESTZUSTELLEN UND QUANTITATIV ZU BESTIMMEN | [2000/38] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTINUOUSLY MONITORING AN AQUEOUS FLOW TO DETECT AND QUANTIFY IONS | [2000/38] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE SURVEILLANCE EN CONTINU D'UN FLUX AQUEUX AFIN DE DETECTER ET QUANTIFIER DES IONS | [2000/38] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2000 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 11.08.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/17] | 22.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/17] | Request for further processing for: | 07.05.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 07.05.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.06.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.01.2002 | 31.12.2005 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3159573 (RITCHIE HAROLD D) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 23 - column 4, line 10 *; | [X]US5282381 (KRONE-SCHMIDT WILFRIED [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 4, line 55 - column 6, line 21 *; | [X]GB1081210 (HEINZGERT AMMER) [X] 1,9 * page 2, line 67 - line 103 *; | [A]DE3641697 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,9 * column 3, line 39 - line 67 * | International search | [A]US4013554 (REIS AUGUST, et al); | [A]US4871427 (KOLESAR JR EDWARD S [US]); | [A]US5521510 (SCHUNCK GUENTER [DE], et al) |