Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3889926B | Global Dossier | 07.03.2007 | B2 | JP2001522166 | 13.11.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | DE9803061 | 19.10.1998 | DE19747457 | 27.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1555199 | Global Dossier | 17.05.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | DE9803061 | 19.10.1998 | DE19747457 | 27.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1027783 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2003 | B1 | EP1027783 | 16.08.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE9803061 | 19.10.1998 | DE19747457 | 27.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9812771 | 16.10.2012 | B1 | BR9812771 | 10.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | DE9803061 | 19.10.1998 | DE19747457 | 27.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59807137D1 | 13.03.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE9803061 | 19.10.1998 | DE19747457 | 27.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6865175 | 08.03.2005 | B1 | Priority number | Date | DE9803061 | 19.10.1998 | DE19747457 | 27.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9922483 | Global Dossier | 06.05.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19747457 | 27.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1126321C | 29.10.2003 | C | CN1283346 | 07.02.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19747457 | 27.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19747457 | 06.04.2000 | C2 | DE19747457 | 29.04.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19747457 | 27.10.1997 |