EP0963638 - DIGITAL SIGNATURE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.09.2006 [2006/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETAT FRANCAIS Représenté par le Délégué Général pour l'Armement "La Rotonde", 26, Boulevard Victor 00460 Armées / FR | [2005/40] |
Former [1999/50] | For all designated states ETAT FRANCAIS Représenté par le Délégué Général pour l'Armement "La Rotonde", 26, Boulevard Victor 00460 Armées / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOUX, Antoine 10, rue d'Alsace F-35235 Thorigne-Fouillard / FR | [1999/50] | Application number, filing date | 98959943.6 | 10.12.1998 | [1999/50] | WO1998FR02680 | Priority number, date | FR19970016061 | 18.12.1997 Original published format: FR 9716061 | [1999/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9933220 | Date: | 01.07.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0963638 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0963638 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
H04L9/3066 (EP,US);
H04L9/3247 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DIGITALEN UNTERSCHRIFT | [1999/50] | English: | DIGITAL SIGNATURE METHOD | [1999/50] | French: | PROCEDE DE SIGNATURE NUMERIQUE | [1999/50] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/50] | 18.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0384475 (SCHNORR CLAUS PETER) [A] 1 * page 4, line 55 - page 5, line 55 * * abstract *; | [DA]US4995082 (SCHNORR CLAUS P [DE]) [DA] 1 |