EP1040330 - METHOD OF USING AN OPTICAL FIBRE AS A HYDROSTATIC PRESSURE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/40] | METHOD FOR APPLICATION OF AN OPTICAL FIBRE AS A HYDROSTATIC PRESSURE SENSOR | ||
[2004/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | 28.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optoplan AS Björkhaugvn. 27, P.O. Box 1963 7002 Trondheim / NO | [2013/17] |
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states Optoplan AS Björkhaugvn. 27, P.O. Box 1963 7002 Trondheim / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRINGLEBOTN, Jon, Thomas Fagerlivn. 17 N-7018 Trondheim / NO | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Rued Langgaards Vej 8 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | ||
Former [2008/31] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | ||
Former [2008/13] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsade 9 P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | ||
Former [2003/16] | Hagmann-Smith, Martin Peter Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford, Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB | ||
Former [2003/10] | Asquith, Julian Peter, et al Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | ||
Former [2000/40] | Dealtry, Brian Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98960111.7 | 08.12.1998 | [2000/40] | WO1998NO00367 | Priority number, date | NO19970006012 | 19.12.1997 Original published format: NO 976012 | [2000/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9932863 | Date: | 01.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1040330 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1040330 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 01.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01L1/24 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
G01L1/246 (EP);
G01D5/35303 (EP);
G01D5/35316 (EP);
G01D5/35341 (EP);
G01L11/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2000/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG EINER OPTISCHEN FASER ALS HYDROSTATISCHER DRUCKSENSOR | [2000/40] | English: | METHOD OF USING AN OPTICAL FIBRE AS A HYDROSTATIC PRESSURE SENSOR | [2004/45] | French: | PROCEDE D'UTILISATION D'UNE FIBRE OPTIQUE COMME CAPTEUR DE PRESSION HYDROSTATIQUE | [2000/40] |
Former [2000/40] | METHOD FOR APPLICATION OF AN OPTICAL FIBRE AS A HYDROSTATIC PRESSURE SENSOR | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 17.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 26.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 23.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2004 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/14] | Request for further processing for: | 23.08.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 23.08.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.09.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 24.04.2013 | [2014/14] | Cited in | International search | [A]US4882716 (LEFEVRE HERVE [FR], et al); | [A]US5064270 (TURPIN MARC [FR], et al); | [A]US5515459 (FARHADIROUSHAN MAHMOUD [GB]); | [XP]US5828059 (UDD ERIC [US]); | [P]US5841131 (SCHROEDER ROBERT J [US], et al); | [P]US5844927 (KRINGLEBOTN JON THOMAS [NO]) |