EP1047703 - A COMBINATORIAL LIBRARY OF MOENOMYCIN ANALOGS AND METHODS OF PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.10.2002 [2002/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Medicine East, Inc. 280 Utah Avenue South San Francisco California / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/21] | For all designated states Advanced Medicine East, Inc. 280 Utah Avenue South San Francisco, California / US | ||
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states Incara Pharmaceutical Corp. P.O. Box 14287 Research Triangle, NC 27709 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLANSON, Nigel, Mark 2 Merritt Lane Rocky Hill, NJ 08553 / US | 02 /
CHAN, Tin, Yau 26 Barlow Road Edison, NJ 08817 / US | 03 /
HATZENBUHLER, Nicole, T. 61 Totten Drive Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 04 /
JAIN, Rakesh, K. 14126 E. Run Drive Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | 05 /
KAKARLA, Ramesh 111 B Taylor Avenue East Brunswick, NJ 08816 / US | 06 /
LIANG, Rui 54-07 Quail Ridge Drive Plainsboro, NJ 08904 / US | 07 /
LIU, Dashan 70 Rice Run East Brunswick, NJ 08816 / US | 08 /
SILVA, Domingos 3-08 Fox Run Drive Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | 09 /
SOFIA, Michael 3 Holly Lane Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Bassil, Nicholas Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | Bassil, Nicholas Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98960228.9 | 17.11.1998 | [2000/44] | WO1998US24406 | Priority number, date | US19970975229 | 21.11.1997 Original published format: US 975229 | [2000/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9926956 | Date: | 03.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1047703 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07H1/00, C07H5/00, C07H15/00 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
C07H15/04 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07H15/203 (EP,US);
C40B40/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/44] | Title | German: | KOMBINATORISCHE BIBLIOTHEK VON MOENOMYCIN-ANALOGA UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2000/44] | English: | A COMBINATORIAL LIBRARY OF MOENOMYCIN ANALOGS AND METHODS OF PRODUCING SAME | [2000/44] | French: | BIBLIOTHEQUE DE COMBINAISONS D'ANALOGUES DE MOENOMYCINE ET PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION DE CES ANALOGUES | [2000/44] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2000 | Search fee paid | 21.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 25.07.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3674866 (LINDNER FRITZ, et al); | [A]US4684626 (WELZEL PETER [DE], et al) |