EP1034246 - USE OF HYDROXYPROPYL METHYL CELLULOSE IN A CONTACT LENS CLEANING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/37] | CONTACT LENS CLEANING COMPOSITIONS | ||
[2010/34] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Revocation of patent | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abbott Medical Optics Inc. 1700 E. St. Andrew Place Santa Ana, CA 92705-4933 / US | [2010/11] |
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states Abbott Medical Optics Inc. 1700 E. St. Andrew Place Santa Ana, CA 92799-5162 / US | ||
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states Advanced Medical Optics, Inc. 1700 East St. Andrew Place Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US | ||
Former [2000/37] | For all designated states Allergan Sales, Inc. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAHAM, Richard 5066 Balsawood Irvine, CA 92612 / US | 02 /
VEHIGE, Joseph, G. 28386 La Pradera Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | [2000/37] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98960464.0 | 24.11.1998 | [2000/37] | WO1998US25148 | Priority number, date | US19970979730 | 26.11.1997 Original published format: US 979730 | [2000/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9927060 | Date: | 03.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1034246 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1034246 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/48, C11D3/22, C11D1/722 | [2000/37] | CPC: |
C11D3/0078 (EP,US);
C11D3/225 (EP,US);
C11D1/008 (EP,US);
C11D1/29 (EP,US);
C11D1/667 (EP,US);
C11D1/72 (EP,US);
C11D1/722 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/37] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON HYDROXYPROPYLMETHYLCELLULOSE IN EINEM REINIGUNGSMITTEL FÜR KONTAKTLINSEN | [2010/34] | English: | USE OF HYDROXYPROPYL METHYL CELLULOSE IN A CONTACT LENS CLEANING COMPOSITION | [2010/34] | French: | UTILISATION D'HYDROXYPROPYLMÉTHYLCELLULOSE DANS UNE COMPOSITION DE NETTOYAGE DE LENTILLES DE CONTACT | [2010/34] |
Former [2000/37] | REINIGUNGSMITTEL FÜR KONTAKTLINSEN | ||
Former [2000/37] | CONTACT LENS CLEANING COMPOSITIONS | ||
Former [2000/37] | COMPOSITIONS DE NETTOYAGE DE LENTILLES DE CONTACT | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/37] | 24.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2009 | Observations by third parties | 18.05.2010 | Observations by third parties | 16.07.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.08.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.01.2012
Hammer, Jens Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.01.2012
Hammer, Jens Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | 20.02.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.02.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.12.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.01.2015 | 26.01.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.02.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.02.2015 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/32] | 20.03.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.04.2011 | BE | 06.04.2011 | CY | 06.04.2011 | DK | 06.04.2011 | FI | 06.04.2011 | SE | 06.04.2011 | GR | 07.07.2011 | PT | 08.08.2011 | IE | 24.11.2011 | LU | 24.11.2011 | CH | 30.11.2011 | LI | 30.11.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | [2015/21] |
Former [2012/01] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 08.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3311577 (RANKIN BILLY F) [X] 1-11,14-17; | [A]US5591426 (DABROWSKI HENRY P [US], et al)[A] 1-3,14-17; | [AP]WO9832421 (BAUSCH & LOMB [US]) [AP] 1-11,14-17 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, Derwent World Patents Index [X] 1-11,14-17 | Examination | WO9500620 | other | US4323467 | EP0180309 | US5356555 |