EP1049981 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MEDIA CONNECTIVITY OVER A PACKET-BASED NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telcordia Technologies, Inc. 445 South Street Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [2000/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARANGO, Mauricio Apartment 26 10 Ridgedale Avenue Madison, NJ 07940 / US | 02 /
CAHL, Louis 445 South Street Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | 03 /
COOK, Michael 445 South Street Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | 04 /
ELY, Thomas, Chambers 1178 Delaware Drive Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 05 /
HUITEMA, Christian Apartment 119N 77 Bleecker Street New York, NY 10012 / US | 06 /
OBROCK, Frederick 445 South Street Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | 07 /
SMYK, Darek, A. 15 Zirkel Avenue Piscataway, NJ 08854 / US | [2000/45] | Representative(s) | Brykman, Georges, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Brykman, Georges, et al Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2000/45] | Brykman, Georges, et al c/o Société de Protection des Inventions, 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98960747.8 | 03.12.1998 | [2000/45] | WO1998US25760 | Priority number, date | US19970067224 | 03.12.1997 Original published format: US 67224 | [2000/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9928827 | Date: | 10.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1049981 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/00 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
H04L65/1069 (EP);
H04L12/6418 (EP);
H04L67/10 (EP);
H04L67/14 (EP);
H04M7/063 (EP);
H04M7/1245 (EP);
H04Q11/0478 (EP);
H04Q3/0045 (EP);
H04L2012/563 (EP);
H04L2012/5663 (EP);
H04L2012/6472 (EP);
H04L2012/6475 (EP);
H04L2012/6486 (EP);
H04M7/126 (EP);
H04M7/128 (EP);
H04M7/129 (EP);
H04Q2213/13034 (EP);
H04Q2213/13176 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, SE [2000/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR MEDIAVERBINDUNG ÜBER EIN PAKET-BASIERTES NETZWERK | [2000/45] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MEDIA CONNECTIVITY OVER A PACKET-BASED NETWORK | [2000/45] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE CONNECTIVITE DE SUPPORTS PAR L'INTERMEDIAIRE D'UN RESEAU A BASE DE PAQUETS | [2000/45] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2000 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 01.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/04] | 20.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4656624 (COLLINS JOHNNY [US], et al); | [Y]US4949373 (BAKER JR WILLIAM T [US], et al); | [Y]US5329619 (PAGE PETER [DE], et al); | [Y]US5550906 (CHAU TOAN [US], et al); | [Y]US5581596 (HOGAN JERRY C [US]); | [YP]US5706286 (REIMAN DOUGLAS P [US], et al); | [YP]US5764750 (CHAU TOAN [US], et al) |