EP1051510 - A RAPID METHOD FOR THE ASSESSMENT OF THE INHIBITION AND KILL OF ANAEROBIC BACTERIA BY TOXIC COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NALCO CHEMICAL COMPANY One Nalco Center Naperville, IL 60563-1198 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | For all designated states NALCO CHEMICAL COMPANY One Nalco Center Naperville Illinois 60563-1198 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWINGEL, William, Richard 930 Darius Lane Naperville, IL 60565 / US | 02 /
KEHOE, Victoria, Margaret 3141 Booth Bay Lane Aurora, IL 60504 / US | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 40- 43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2002/05] | Molyneaux, Martyn William Wildman, Harrold, Allen & Dixon 11th Floor, Tower 3, Clements Inn London WC2A 2AZ / GB | ||
Former [2000/46] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer c/o Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98960774.2 | 04.12.1998 | [2000/46] | WO1998US25864 | Priority number, date | US19970995144 | 29.12.1997 Original published format: US 995144 | [2000/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9934013 | Date: | 08.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1051510 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.07.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/18, C12Q1/22 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
C12Q1/18 (EP,KR);
C12Q1/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, NL, PT, SE [2000/46] | Title | German: | SCHNELLVERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN DER HEMMUNG UND TÖTUNG VON ANAEROBEN BAKTERIEN DURCH TOXISCHE VERBINDUNGEN | [2000/46] | English: | A RAPID METHOD FOR THE ASSESSMENT OF THE INHIBITION AND KILL OF ANAEROBIC BACTERIA BY TOXIC COMPOUNDS | [2000/46] | French: | PROCEDE RAPIDE POUR EVALUER L'INHIBITION ET LA DESTRUCTION DE BACTERIES ANAEROBIES PAR DES COMPOSES TOXIQUES | [2000/46] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2000 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 01.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/01] | 04.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0790299 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO9718324 (UNIV MONTANA RES DEV INST [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US5374536 (ROBERTSON LINDA R [US]); | [Y]US5252484 (MATNER RICHARD R [US], et al); | [Y]US5206151 (ROBERTSON LINDA R [US]) |