EP1038206 - TECHNIQUES FOR TRANSFERRING HOLOGRAMS INTO METAL SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALUMINUM COMPANY OF AMERICA Alcoa Technical Center, 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center Pennsylvania 15069-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states ALUMINUM COMPANY OF AMERICA Alcoa Technical Center, 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, Pennsylvania 15069-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAEFER, Mark, W. Alcoa, NP 224, 2300 North Wright Road Alcoa, TN 37701 / US | 02 /
LEVENDUSKY, Thomas, L. 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, PA 15069 / US | 03 /
SHEU, Simon 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, PA 15069 / US | 04 /
LARSEN, Robert, B. 1011 Ross Drive Maryville, TN 37801 / US | 05 /
WHITTLE, Neville, C. 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, PA 15069 / US | [2000/39] | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al c/o Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98960777.5 | 07.12.1998 | [2000/39] | WO1998US25899 | Priority number, date | US19970991101 | 12.12.1997 Original published format: US 991101 | [2000/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9931557 | Date: | 24.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1038206 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G03H1/02, B44C1/24, B44F1/10, B44B5/00 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
B21H8/005 (EP,US);
B21B27/005 (EP,US);
B21H8/02 (EP,US);
G03H1/028 (EP,US);
G03H1/0244 (EP,US);
G03H2001/0055 (EP,US);
G03H2001/043 (EP,US);
G03H2270/13 (EP,US);
G03H2270/52 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/39] | Title | German: | VORGEHENSWEISE ZUM TRANSFERIEREN EINES HOLOGRAMMS AUF EINE METALLOBERFLÄCHE | [2000/39] | English: | TECHNIQUES FOR TRANSFERRING HOLOGRAMS INTO METAL SURFACES | [2000/39] | French: | TECHNIQUES DE TRANSFERT D'HOLOGRAMMES SUR DES SURFACES METALLIQUES | [2000/39] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.06.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 05.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/33] | 10.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/33] | Request for further processing for: | 26.03.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 26.03.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.04.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US3875026 (WIDMER ROLAND WERNER) [AD] 1 * claim - *; | [AD]US3944420 (GALE MICHAEL THOMAS, et al) [AD] 1 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 16 *; | [A]US4725111 (WEITZEN EDWARD H [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [AD]US4773718 (WEITZEN EDWARD H [US], et al) [AD] 1* column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 29 *; | [A]US4906315 (MCGREW STEPHEN P [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 17 *; | [A]WO9101225 (EMBOSSING TECHNOLOGY LTD U K [GB]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 10 - page 5, line 11 *; | [AD]US5059499 (TEITEL MICHAEL [US]) [AD] 1 * column 2, line 4 - line 45 *; | [A]US5327825 (PARKER HARRY A [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 3 * * column 3, line 15 - column 5, line 2 * |