EP1040335 - DISCRIMINATING GROUND VEGETATION IN AGRICULTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weed Control Australia Ltd. C/- Horwath 128 Hay Street Subiaco, W.A. 6008 / AU | [2004/35] |
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states Weed Control Australia Ltd. 2 Shoal Court Coogee, W.A. 6166 / AU | ||
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states Weed Control Australia Pty. Ltd. 2 Shoal Court Coogee, W.A. 6166 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUCKER, Robert, Manning P.O. Box 2433 Bunbury, W.A. 6231 / AU | 02 /
SCOTT, Christopher, Charles Beermullah Road Gingin, W.A. 6503 / AU | [2001/12] |
Former [2000/40] | 01 /
TUCKER, Robert, Manning 1/12 Clifton Street Bunbury, W.A. 6230 / AU | ||
02 /
SCOTT, Christopher, Charles Beermullah Road Gingin, W.A. 6503 / AU | Representative(s) | Marshall, Caroline, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | Marshall, Caroline, et al Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2000/40] | Dealtry, Brian Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98960875.7 | 08.12.1998 | [2000/40] | WO1998AU01018 | Priority number, date | AU1997PP00781 | 08.12.1997 Original published format: AU PP078197 | AU1998PP03267 | 30.04.1998 Original published format: AU PP326798 | [2000/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9930133 | Date: | 17.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1040335 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 17.06.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/25, G01N21/31, G01N21/63, B05B12/02, B05B12/12, B05B15/04, B05D1/02, A01M21/04, A01M7/00, A01B79/00 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
G01N21/359 (EP,US);
A01M7/0089 (EP,US);
B05B12/122 (EP,US);
G01N21/3563 (EP,US);
G01N2021/8466 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/40] | G01N21/25, G01N21/31, G01N21/63, B05B12/02, B05B12/12, B05B15/04, B05D1/02, A01M21/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/40] | Extension states | LT | 23.06.2000 | RO | 23.06.2000 | Title | German: | UNTERSCHEIDUNG VON GRUNDBEWUCHS IN DER LANDSCHAFT | [2000/40] | English: | DISCRIMINATING GROUND VEGETATION IN AGRICULTURE | [2000/40] | French: | PROCEDE D'IDENTIFICATION DE VEGETATION EN AGRICULTURE | [2000/40] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2000 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 23.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 28.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/27] | 13.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0797916 (KAMPS DE WILD B V [NL]) [X] 1,4,6,7,9,14-16,19,20 * column 2, line 37 - column 4, line 4 * * figure -; claim - *; | [XA]US5389781 (BECK JIM [US], et al) [X] 1,6-8,14,15,19 * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 16 * * figure -; claim - * * figure -; claim - * [A] ; | [XA]US5585626 (BECK JAMES L [US], et al) [X] 1,16,19 * column 13, line 30 - column 14, line 4 * * figure -; claim - * [A] 6-8 | International search | [X]DE4413739 (DEUTSCHE FORSCH LUFT RAUMFAHRT [DE], et al); | [X]US5507115 (NELSON TERRENCE W J [CA]); | [A]WO8912510 (MINI AGRICULTURE RURAL AFFAIRS [AU]); | [A]WO9402812 (PATCHEN CALIFORNIA INC [US]); | [A]DE4446481 (ORTLOFF PETER [DE]) | by applicant | US5144767 |