EP1094832 - THERAPEUTIC USE OF UNCOUPLING PROTEIN-HHFCW60 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.12.2002 [2002/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | For all designated states SmithKline Beecham plc 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | ||
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC New Horizons Court Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLAPHAM, John, C., SmithKline Beecham Pharma. New Frontiers Science Park South, ThirdAvenue Harlow CM19 5AW / GB | 02 /
BEELEY, Lee, J., SmithKline Beecham Pharma. New Frontiers Science Park South, Third Avenue Harlow CM19 5AW / GB | 03 /
GODDEN, Robert, J. SmithKline Beecham Pharma. New Frontiers Science Park South, Third Avenue Harlow CM19 5AW / GB | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Crump, Julian Richard John Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Crump, Julian Richard John FJ Cleveland, 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98961248.6 | 02.12.1998 | [2001/18] | WO1998EP07802 | Priority number, date | GB19980014926 | 09.07.1998 Original published format: GB 9814926 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0002577 | Date: | 20.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1094832 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/17, A61K48/00 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K48/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2001/18] | Title | German: | THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNG DES ENTKOPPELNDEN PROTEINS-HHFCW60 | [2001/18] | English: | THERAPEUTIC USE OF UNCOUPLING PROTEIN-HHFCW60 | [2001/18] | French: | UTILISATION THERAPEUTIQUE DE LA PROTEINE DECOUPLANTE HHFCW60 | [2001/18] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 25.10.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PXD]WO9839432 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [PXD] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9845438 (BETH ISRAEL HOSPITAL [US], et al) [PX] 1,4,6-8 * abstract * * page 3, line 8 - line 19 * * page 4, line 28 - line 34 * * page 8, line 15 - line 21 * * page 27, line 13 - line 32 * * page 46, line 1 - page 48, line 34 * * page 61, line 22 - page 63, line 4 * * claims 1-3,5,22,23 *; | [PX]WO9850542 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [PX] 1,4-8 * abstract * * page 1, line 10 - line 27 * * page 3, line 24 - line 29 * * page 4, line 3 - line 9 * * page 6, line 10 - line 33 * * page 14, line 9 - page 16, line 33 * * claims 1,2,5 *; | [X] - BOSS O ET AL, "UNCOUPLING PROTEIN-3: A NEW MEMBER OF THE MITOCHONDRIAL CARRIER FAMILY WITH TISSUE-SPECIFIC EXPRESSION", FEBS LETTERS, (1997), vol. 408, no. 1, pages 39 - 42, XP002067895 [X] 1,4,5,7,8 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 42, column 1, line 11 - line 19 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(97)00384-0 | [A] - NÈGRE-SALVAYRE A ET AL, "A role for uncoupling protein-2 as a regulator of mitochondrial hydrogen peroxide generation", FASEB J, (1997), vol. 11, pages 809 - 815, XP002100248 [A] 1-3 * abstract * * page 814, column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 17 * * page 814, column 2, line 44 - page 815, column 1, line 9 * |